Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1064529

EP1064529 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHECKING THE TIGHTNESS OF AIR EVACUATED PACKING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2001/01]
Inventor(s)01 / WEBER, Helmut
Am Wasserfall 3
D-71384 Weinstadt-Beutelsbach / DE
02 / STADEL, Hans-Peter
Gaertnerweg 13
D-73547 Lorch / DE
[2001/01]
Application number, filing date98965101.307.12.1998
[2001/01]
WO1998DE03576
Priority number, dateDE199811328826.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19813288
[2001/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9949291
Date:30.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1064529
Date:03.01.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1064529
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01M3/36
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FI,   FR,   IT,   LI [2001/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER DICHTIGKEIT VON EVAKUIERTEN VERPACKUNGSBEHÄLTERN[2001/01]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHECKING THE TIGHTNESS OF AIR EVACUATED PACKING CONTAINERS[2001/01]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CONTROLER L'ETANCHEITE DE CONTENANTS D'EMBALLAGE DONT L'AIR A ETE EVACUE[2001/01]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2000National basic fee paid 
26.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
14.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2003Fee for grant paid
26.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[AD]US4899574  (POTTEIGER THOMAS M [US]) [AD] 1-12 * claims 1-19 *;
 [Y]EP0277458  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [Y] 1,4,8 * claims 1-10,14-21 *;
 [Y]DE4412763  (WITSCHI ELECTRONIC AG [CH]) [Y] 1,8 * column 1 - column 2 *;
 [Y]EP0181722  (NIPPON OXYGEN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4 * page 4 - page 6 *;
 [A]US5111684  (STAUFFER ANTON [US], et al) [A] 1,4,8 * claims 1-15 *;
 [A]US4715215  (PERHACH JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 8-12 * column 3 - column 8 *;
 [A]US4663964  (CROCE CARLO P [US]) [A] 8 * column 3 - column 4 *;
 [A]JPH03156336  ;
 [A]JPS5717833
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911003), vol. 015, no. 391, Database accession no. (P - 1259), [A] 1,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820520), vol. 006, no. 082, Database accession no. (P - 116), [A] 8 * abstract *