EP1036054 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING 1,2-DICHLOROETHANE BY OXYCHLORINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vinnolit Monomer GmbH & Co. KG Carl-Zeiss-Ring 25 85737 Ismaning / DE | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERTL, Horst Goellstrasse 18 D-84524 Neuoetting / DE | 02 /
KAMMERHOFER, Peter Ortlehnerstrasse 48 D-84508 Burgkirchen / DE | 03 /
SCHWARZMAIER, Peter Billerstrasse 10 D-84556 Kastl / DE | 04 /
MIELKE, Ingolf Hochstaufenstrasse 16 D-84508 Burgkirchen / DE | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/38] | Schuderer, Michael, Dr., et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98965167.4 | 19.11.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998EP07444 | Priority number, date | DE1997153165 | 01.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19753165 | [2000/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928280 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036054 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036054 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/156, C07C19/045 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
B01J8/1872 (EP,US);
B01J8/006 (EP,US);
C07C17/156 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/156, C07C19/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,2-DICHLORETHAN DURCH OXICHLORIERUNG | [2000/38] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING 1,2-DICHLOROETHANE BY OXYCHLORINATION | [2000/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DU 1,2-DICHLOROETHANE PAR OXYCHLORATION | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 18.05.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 17.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1468488 (PITTSBURGH PLATE GLASS CO) [A] 1-4; | [A]GB1256245 (PRINCETON CHEMICAL RES INC [US]) [A] 1-4; | [A]GB1351700 (FMC CORP) [A] 1-4; | [A]EP0103940 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-4; | [A]DE19546068 (HOECHST AG [DE])[A] 1-4 |