Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032669

EP1032669 - RECOMBINANT ALLERGEN WITH REDUCED ENZYMATIC ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.05.2009
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Revocation of patentpublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a.
rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[N/P]
Former [2006/06]For all designated states
Glaxosmithkline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Former [2003/03]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS S.A.
89 rue de l'Institut
1330 Rixensart / BE
Inventor(s)01 / BRUCK, Claudine
SK. B. Biol. S.A., Rue de l'Institut 89
B-1330 Rixensart / BE
02 / BOLLEN, Alex
U L de Bruxelles, S de G A, Rue de l'Industrie 24
B-1400 Nivelles / BE
03 / JACOBS, Paul
U L de Bruxelles, S de G A, Rue de l'Industrie 24
B-1400 Nivelles / BE
04 / MASSAER, Marc
U L de Bruxelles, S de G A, Rue de l'Industrie 24
B-1400 Nivelles / BE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Elmhirst, Elizabeth Lucy , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/20]Elmhirst, Elizabeth Lucy , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9 25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex
TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2000/36]Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William , et al
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date98965170.816.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998EP07521
Priority number, dateGB1997002453119.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9724531
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9925823
Date:27.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1032669
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032669
Date:08.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C07K14/435, A61K39/35
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/36]
TitleGerman:REKOMBINANTES ALLERGEN MIT REDUZIERTER ENZYMATISCHER AKTIVITÄT[2000/36]
English:RECOMBINANT ALLERGEN WITH REDUCED ENZYMATIC ACTIVITY[2000/36]
French:ALLERGENE DE RECOMBINAISON A ACTIVITE ENZYMATIQUE REDUITE[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2000National basic fee paid 
12.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
01.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
26.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2005Fee for grant paid
23.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06075195.5  / EP1674576
EP08161296.2  / EP2017342
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.11.2006   
ALK-ABELLO A/S
P.O. Box 408
2970 Hörsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Turner, Mark Frederic Paris
Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45
2970 Hørsholm / DK
 [N/P]
Former [2006/50]
Opponent(s)01  07.11.2006   
ALK-ABELLO A/S
P.O. Box 408
2970 Hörsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Turner, Mark Frederic Paris
Inspicos A/S Bøge Allé 5 P.O. Box 45
DK-2970 Hørsholm / DK
13.12.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.06.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/26]
05.02.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.02.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Request for further processing for:22.06.2005Request for further processing filed
22.06.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.07.2005Decision despatched
26.03.2004Request for further processing filed
26.03.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
[2006/45]
Former [2006/42]CH08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9405790  (IMMULOGIC PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION ;THOMAS WR (AU); CHUA K-Y (AU)) [X] 11 * page 47 - page 49; examples 1-4 *;
 [XD]  - TOPHAM CM ET AL, "Comparative modelling of major house dust mite allergen Der pI: structure validation using an extended environmental amino acid propensy table", PROTEIN ENGINEERING., ENGLAND GB, (1994), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 869 - 894, XP002101656 [XD] 1-4,18,21,22 * page 869, column R, paragraph L *
 [A]  - HEWITT CR ET AL, "Heterogeneous proteolytic specificity and activity of the house dust mite proteinase allergen Der p I.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY,, ENGLAND, (199702), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 201 - 207, XP002101657 [A] 1-22 * page 206, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2222.1997.d01-492.x
 [A]  - HEWITT CR ET AL, "A major house dust mite allergen disrupts the immunoglobulin E network by selectively cleaving CD23: innate protection by antiproteases.", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDECINE, UNITED STATES, (199511), vol. 182, no. 5, pages 1537 - 1544, XP002101668 [A] 1-22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.182.5.1537