EP0968107 - STRUCTURAL COMPONENT CONSISTING OF A BELT BUCKLE, ATTACHMENT HARDWARE AND A FORCE LIMITER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73553 Alfdorf / DE | [2000/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEILE, Herbert Am Kesselberg 16 D-73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98965280.5 | 17.12.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998EP08305 | Priority number, date | DE1998200909U | 20.01.1998 Original published format: DE 29800909 U | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937509 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968107 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/28 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
B60R22/28 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/01] | Title | German: | BAUGRUPPE AUS EINEM GURTSCHLOSS, EINEM BEFESTIGUNGSBESCHLAG SOWIE EINEM KRAFTBEGRENZER | [2000/01] | English: | STRUCTURAL COMPONENT CONSISTING OF A BELT BUCKLE, ATTACHMENT HARDWARE AND A FORCE LIMITER | [2000/01] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONSTITUE D'UNE BOUCLE DE CEINTURE, D'UNE ARMATURE DE FIXATION ET D'UN LIMITEUR DE FORCE | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3280942 (RALPH MILLINGTON) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1531516 (HOEPPNER WILLI) [A] 1 * pages 1-2; figures 3,4 *; | [A]FR2273692 (BOCCIARELLI JEAN [FR]) [A] 1 * pages 1-2; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2621983 (ZINSER MASCHINENBAU KG) [A] 1 * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2367510 (ZINSER MASCHINENBAU KG [DE]) [A] 1-3,6,7,10 * page 9, lines 7-29; figure 10 *; | [A]US4674801 (DIPAOLA DONALD A [US], et al) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [DA]DE3723772 (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [DA] 8* abstract *; | [A]US5113981 (LANTZ MICHAEL D [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |