EP1047629 - METHOD FOR PRETREATING A CATALYST MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | For all designated states Ballard Power Systems AG Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states Ballard Power Systems AG Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE | |||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states XCELLSIS AG Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE | |||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states XCELLSIS AG Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE | |||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states XCELLSIS GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | |||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states DBB Fuel Cell Engines Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUTENRIETH, Rainer Erlenbachstrasse 38 D-89155 Erbach / DE | 02 /
BRAUCHLE, Stefan Kastanienweg 23 D-88400 Biberach/Riss / DE | 03 /
KUMBERGER, Otto Rennershofstrasse 18 D-68163 Mannheim / DE | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Kocher, Klaus-Peter Daimler AG Intellectual Property Management IPM, C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Kocher, Klaus-Peter, Dipl.-Phys. c/o DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management IPM, C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98965286.2 | 19.12.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998EP08338 | Priority number, date | DE1998101373 | 16.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19801373 | [2000/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936350 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047629 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047629 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/32, B01J37/18, B01J37/14 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
B01J37/18 (EP,US);
B01J37/14 (EP,US);
C01B3/326 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1076 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORBEHANDLUNG EINES KATALYSATORMATERIALS | [2000/44] | English: | METHOD FOR PRETREATING A CATALYST MATERIAL | [2000/44] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT LE TRAITEMENT PREALABLE D'UN MATERIAU CATALYSEUR | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0975734 ; | [DA]JPS63310703 ; | [A]JPS5817836 ; | [X]EP0192289 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1-6 * page 4, line 29 - page 6, line 2 *; | [X]US4822824 (IGLESIA ENRIQUE [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 3 - line 14 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 4 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0601957 (TOPSOE HALDOR AS [DK]) [A] 1,4* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 097, no. 007, & JP09075734 A 19970325 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC) [X] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890412), vol. 013, no. 151, Database accession no. (C - 584), & JP63310703 A 19881219 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [DA] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830415), vol. 007, no. 091, Database accession no. (C - 162), & JP58017836 A 19830202 (FUJI DENKI SEIZO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |