Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032951

EP1032951 - GAS DIFFUSION ELECTRODES AND THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.02.2004  [2004/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
For all designated states
Bayerisches Zentrum für Angewandte Energieforschung e.V. ZAE Bayern
Am Hubland
97074 Würzburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
For all designated states
Bayerisches Zentrum für Angewandte Energieforschung e.V. ZAE Bayern
Am Hubland
97074 Würzburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LEUSCHNER, Rainer
Lindenweg 17
D-91091 Grossenseebach / DE
02 / LIPINSKI, Matthias
Danziger Strasse 20
D-91052 Erlangen / DE
03 / PETRICEVIC, Raino
Bossistrasse 4
D-97080 Würzburg / DE
04 / FRICKE, Jochen
Gieshügeler 63
D-97218 Gerbrunn / DE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Berg, Peter
European Patent Attorney
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/06]Berg, Peter
European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2000/36]Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf.
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date98965583.218.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998DE03417
Priority number, dateDE199715129719.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19751297
[2000/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927597
Date:03.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032951
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032951
Date:26.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/96, C04B38/00, C04B35/524
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:GASDIFFUSIONSELEKTRODE UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2000/36]
English:GAS DIFFUSION ELECTRODES AND THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[2000/36]
French:ELECTRODE DE SEPARATION PAR DIFFUSION GAZEUSE ET SA PRODUCTION[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase17.04.2000National basic fee paid 
17.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
09.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2002Fee for grant paid
19.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.02.2003
DK26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
ES28.08.2003
[2004/04]
Former [2004/02]FI26.02.2003
DK26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
Former [2003/41]FI26.02.2003
SE26.05.2003
Former [2003/32]SE26.05.2003
Cited inInternational search[EA]WO9901502  (OCELLUS INC [US], et al) [E] 1,3,4 * page 2, lines 15-17; claims 55,61 * [A] 6;
 [DA]DE19523382  (FRICKE JOCHEN PROF DR [DE], et al) [DA] 1,2,6,9,10 * claim 1 *;
 [DA]WO9506002  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [DA] 1,6,9 * claims 1,8,14,29 *;
 JPS6451385  [ ] (IBIDEN CO LTD);
 JPS6212681  [ ] (OJI PAPER CO);
 [DA]WO9314511  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [DA] * claim 33 *
 [A]  - Y. UNO, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890918), vol. 111, no. 12, Database accession no. 101922t, XP000181530 [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - O. IWAKI, ET AL., CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870518), vol. 106, no. 20, Database accession no. 161603w, XP002100057 [A] * abstract *