blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1038080

EP1038080 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS AUTHORIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  22.02.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2013Change: Legal effect of interlocutory decision 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2008/13]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMITZ, Stephan
Seyfferstrasse 53
D-70197 Stuttgart / DE
02 / MATHONY, Hans-Joerg
Schorndorfer Weg 32
D-71732 Tamm / DE
[2000/39]
Application number, filing date98965587.320.11.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998DE03431
Priority number, dateDE1997105509211.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19755092
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9929986
Date:17.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038080
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038080
Date:21.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/17]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1038080
Date:26.03.2008
Language:DE
[2008/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:E05B49/00, G07C9/00, B60R25/00
[2000/39]
CPC:
B60R25/24 (EP); G07C9/00309 (EP); G07C9/28 (EP);
G07C2009/00388 (EP); G07C2009/00412 (EP); G07C2009/0042 (EP);
G07C2009/00769 (EP); G07C2009/00873 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR KONTROLLE DER ZUGANGSBERECHTIGUNG[2000/39]
English:SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS AUTHORIZATION[2000/39]
French:SYSTEME DE CONTROLE D'AUTORISATION D'ACCES[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2000National basic fee paid 
11.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
28.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2004Fee for grant paid
20.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.01.2005    ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Schweiz AG
Albisriederstr. 245
8047 Zürich / CH
Opponent's representative
Fischer, Michael
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/11]
Opponent(s)01  20.01.2005    ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Schweiz AG
Albisriederstr. 245
8047 Zürich / CH
Opponent's representative
Fischer, Michael, Dr.
Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
23.05.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.11.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.02.2007Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.02.2007Date of oral proceedings
14.05.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.05.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.09.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
27.12.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0811739  (MEGAMOS F & G SICHERHEIT [DE]) [A] 1,3,6 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 18; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19501004  (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 57; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0605996  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 39; figure 1 *
by applicantDE4428947
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.