Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034292

EP1034292 - CELL-SPECIFIC RETROVIRAL VECTORS WITH ANTIBODY DOMAINS AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF FOR SELECTIVE GENE TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bundesrepublik Deutschland, letztvertreten durch den Präsidenten des Paul-Ehrlich-Instituts Prof. Dr. R. Kurth
Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 51-59
63225 Langen / DE
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / CICHUTEK, Klaus
Grosser Hasenpfad 114
D-60598 Frankfurt am Main / DE
02 / ENGELSTÄDTER, Martin
Isarstrasse 8
D-63110 Rodgau / DE
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Grund, Martin , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Grund, Martin, Dr. , et al
Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98965603.827.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998DE03543
Priority number, dateDE199712585428.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19725854
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9928489
Date:10.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1034292
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034292
Date:03.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/86, C12N5/10, A61K48/00
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
Extension statesAL28.06.2000
LT28.06.2000
LV28.06.2000
MK28.06.2000
RO28.06.2000
SI28.06.2000
TitleGerman:ZELLSPEZIFISCHE RETROVIRALE VEKTOREN MIT ANTIKÖRPERDOMÄNEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG FÜR DEN SELEKTIVEN GENTRANSFER[2000/37]
English:CELL-SPECIFIC RETROVIRAL VECTORS WITH ANTIBODY DOMAINS AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF FOR SELECTIVE GENE TRANSFER[2000/37]
French:VECTEURS RETROVIRAUX A SPECIFICITE CELLULAIRE DOTES DE DOMAINES DE RECONNAISSANCE D'ANTICORPS ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DESDITS VECTEURS POUR LE TRANSFERT SELECTIF DE GENES[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2000National basic fee paid 
20.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
05.07.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
11.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
13.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2002Fee for grant paid
03.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI03.07.2002
FR03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
IT03.07.2002
NL03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
LU27.11.2002
BE30.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2004/51]FI03.07.2002
FR03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
NL03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
LU27.11.2002
BE30.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2004/39]FI03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
NL03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
LU27.11.2002
BE30.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2004/10]FI03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
NL03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
BE30.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2004/04]FI03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
NL03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2003/46]FI03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
NL03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/22]FI03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
NL03.07.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/20]FI03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
NL03.07.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/14]FI03.07.2002
NL03.07.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/09]NL03.07.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE03.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9523846  (UNIV NEW JERSEY MED [US]) [X] 10-18 * column W *;
 [A]WO9301288  (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column W *;
 [A]EP0104014  (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]) [A] 1-9 * column W *;
 [DX]  - CHU T. H. ET AL., "Toward highly efficient cell-type- specific gene transfer with retroviral vectors displaying single-chain antibodies.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (199701), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 720 - 725, XP002103150 [DX] 10-18 * column W *
 [DA]  - CHISWELL D. J. ET AL., "PHAGE ANTIBODIES: WILL NEW 'COLICLONAL' ANTIBODIES REPLACE MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES?", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (19920301), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 80 - 84, XP000249633 [DA] 1-9 * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(92)90178-X
 [A]  - LANG I. M. ET AL., "Recombinant rabbit Fab with binding activity to type-1 plasminogen activator inhibitor derived from a phage-display library against human alpha-granules", GENE, (19960626), vol. 172, no. 2, pages 295 - 298, XP002103151 [A] 1-9 * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(96)00021-2
 [T]  - JIANG A. ET AL., "Cell-type-specific gene transfer into human cells with retroviral vectors that display single-chain antibodies.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (199812), vol. 72, no. 12, pages 10148 - 10156, XP002103152 [T] 10-18 * column W *