Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1064738

EP1064738 - METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A COMMUNICATION ON A STANDBY LINK IN OPTICAL TRANSMISSION FACILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JAHREIS, Oliver
Agnes-Bernauer-Strasse 17
D-80687 München / DE
02 / HEILES, Jürgen
Schaftlachstrasse 22
D-81371 München / DE
[2001/01]
Application number, filing date98965605.303.12.1998
[2001/01]
WO1998DE03561
Priority number, dateDE199811183118.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19811831
DE199813586307.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835863
[2001/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9948229
Date:23.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1064738
Date:03.01.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1064738
Date:19.04.2006
Language:DE
[2006/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/00, H04B10/08
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SCHALTUNG EINER ERSATZVERBINDUNG BEI OPTISCHEN UBERTRAGUNGSEINRICHTUNGEN[2001/01]
English:METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A COMMUNICATION ON A STANDBY LINK IN OPTICAL TRANSMISSION FACILITIES[2001/01]
French:PROCEDE POUR REALISER UNE COMMUTATION SUR UNE LIAISON DE SECOURS DANS DES INSTALLATIONS DE TRANSMISSION OPTIQUES[2001/01]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2000National basic fee paid 
12.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
18.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2004Fee for grant paid
06.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)22.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5706277  (KLINK JOACHIM [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6,8,11,12 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 43 * * column 6, line 51 - line 56 * * column 11, line 30 - line 42 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0535858  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [Y] 1,3,6,8,11,12 * column 3, line 31 - line 46; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]JPS61232734  ;
 [A]JPS60160734
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870307), vol. 011, no. 077, Database accession no. (E - 487), [Y] 2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851224), vol. 009, no. 328, Database accession no. (E - 369), [A] 1 * abstract *