Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034186

EP1034186 - SYNTHETIC PEPTIDES CONTAINING CITRULLINE RECOGNIZED BY RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS SERA AS TOOLS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innogenetics N.V.
Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7, Box 4
9052 Ghent / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
INNOGENETICS N.V.
Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7, Box 4
9052 Gent / BE
Inventor(s)01 / MEHEUS, Lydie
Gontrodeheirweg 120
B-9820 Merelbeke / BE
02 / UNION, Ann
Savooien 15
B-9880 Aalter / BE
03 / RAYMACKERS, Joseph
Zuiderbiesten 10
B-9810 Eke / BE
[2000/37]
Application number, filing date98965715.030.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998EP07714
Priority number, dateEP1997087019528.11.1997         Original published format: EP 97870195
EP1998087007809.04.1998         Original published format: EP 98870078
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9928344
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1034186
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47, C07K1/107, C07K16/18, A61K38/17, G01N33/564
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
Extension statesAL13.06.2000
LT13.06.2000
LV13.06.2000
MK13.06.2000
RO13.06.2000
SI13.06.2000
TitleGerman:CITRULLIN-ENTHALTENDE SYNTHETISCHE PEPTIDE, REAKTIV MIT SEREN VON PATIENTEN MIT RHEUMATISCHE ARTHRITIS, ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG[2000/37]
English:SYNTHETIC PEPTIDES CONTAINING CITRULLINE RECOGNIZED BY RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS SERA AS TOOLS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT[2000/37]
French:PEPTIDES SYNTHETIQUES CONTENANT UNE CITRULLINE RECONNUE PAR LES SERUMS DE MALADES ATTEINTS DE POLYARTHRITE RHUMATOIDE COMME DES OUTILS DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE TRAITEMENT[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2000National basic fee paid 
13.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
01.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/49]
04.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9822503  (STICHTING SCHEIKUNDIG ONDERZOE [NL], et al) [PX] 1-14,16-26 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO9808946  (BIOMERIEUX SA [FR], et al) [XP] 1-14,16-26 * the whole document * * page 4, line 20 - line 30 * * page 6 - page 7; claim - *;
 [X]WO9219649  (CLONATEC SA [FR]) [X] 1,3-11,13,14,16-26 * page 4, line 22 - line 33 * * abstract *;
 [A]US5660994  (BRUDER-HEID GERDA [DE], et al) [A] * table 1 *
 [PX]  - G.A. SCHELLEKENS ET AL., "CITRULLINE IS AN ESSENTIAL CONSTITUENT OF ANTIGENIC DETERMINANTS RECOGNISED BY RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS-SPECIFIC AUTOANTIBODIES", J. CLIN. INVEST., (199801), vol. 101, no. 1, pages 273 - 281, XP002105185 [PX] 1-14,16-26 * abstract *
 [X]  - SCHELLEKENS G A ET AL, "THE MODIFIED ARGININE RESIDUE CITRULLINE IS THE MAJOR CONSTITUENT OF EPITOPES RECOGNIZED BY AUTOANTIBODIES IN SERA FROM RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS PATIENTS", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (19971108), vol. 40, no. 9, SUPPL. 08, page S276, XP002067877 [X] 1,3-11,13,14,16-26 * abstract *
 [X]  - T.SENSHU ET AL, "Preferential deimination of keratin K1 and Filaggrin during the terminal differentiation of human epidermis", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS., ORLANDO, FL US, (1996), vol. 225, pages 712 - 719, XP002105186 [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * * page 717, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1996.1240
 [X]  - E. TARCSA ET AL., "Protein unfolding by peptidylarginine deiminase", J. BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (199611), vol. 271, no. 48, pages 30709 - 30716, XP002105187 [X] 1,2,6,9-12 * abstract * * table I *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.48.30709
 [A]  - SIMON M ET AL, "THE CYTOKERATIN FILAMENT-AGGREGATING PROTEIN FILAGGRIN IS THE TARGET OF THE SO-CALLED " ANTIKERATIN ANTIBODIES," AUTOANTIBODIES SPECIFIC FOR RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (19930901), vol. 92, no. 3, pages 1387 - 1393, XP002038026

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI116713