Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036043

EP1036043 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MAN-MADE VITREOUS FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/38]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MAN-MADE VITREOUS FIBRES
[2000/48]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rockwool International A/S
Hovedgaden 501
2640 Hedehusene / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Rockwool International A/S
Hovedgaden 501
DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK
Inventor(s)01 / JENSEN, Soren, Lund
Rudesovej 11
DK-2840 Holte / DK
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98965737.402.12.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998EP07827
Priority number, dateEP1997030967402.12.1997         Original published format: EP 97309674
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928251
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036043
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036043
Date:06.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/05, C03B37/08, C03B5/24, G01B11/00
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Extension statesRO23.06.2000
SI23.06.2000
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GLASARTIGEN KUNSTFASERN[2000/48]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MAN-MADE VITREOUS FIBRES[2000/48]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRES VITREUSES[2000/48]
Former [2000/38]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GLASARTIGEN KUNSTFASERN
Former [2000/38]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MAN-MADE VITREOUS FIBRES
Former [2000/38]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRES VITREUSES
Entry into regional phase23.06.2000National basic fee paid 
23.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
10.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2001Fee for grant paid
02.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.12.2002  09.01.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Paroc Group Oy Ab
Neilikkatie 17
01300 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/17]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2002  09.01.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Paroc Group Oy Ab
Neilikkatie 17
01300 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
VOSSIUS & PARTNER, et al
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2003/05]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2002  09.01.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Paroc Group Oy Ab
Neilikkatie 17
01300 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
Haimelin, Jukka Ilmari
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
14.01.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.07.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.04.2004Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/41]
28.04.2004Date of oral proceedings
05.05.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.05.2004Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Licence(s)ID:01 00/not-exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:ROCKWOOL ISOLATION S.A., société anonyme
111, rue du Château des Rentiers
75013 PARIS / FR
Date:02.06.2001
ID:02 00/not-exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:Rockfon SAS
111, rue du Château des Rentiers
75013 Paris / FR
Date:02.06.2001
[2001/31]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH06.03.2002
LI06.03.2002
DK06.06.2002
[2019/12]
Former [2018/28]CH06.03.2002
ES06.03.2002
LI06.03.2002
DK06.06.2002
Former [2003/46]CH06.03.2002
LI06.03.2002
DK06.06.2002
Former [2003/01]CH06.03.2002
LI06.03.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9002711  (PARTEK AB [FI]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0622341  (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9007470  (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]) [A] 1 * the whole document *