Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1045770

EP1045770 - HYDRAULIC SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A HINGED CONVERTIBLE TOP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.2002
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BAUMERT, Jochen
Schenkstrasse 5
D-60489 Frankfurt / DE
02 / KERN, Eckhart
Hofheimer Strasse 35
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
[2000/43]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [2000/43]Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date98965843.016.12.1998
[2000/43]
WO1998EP08250
Priority number, dateDE199810098514.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19800985
[2000/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936282
Date:22.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1045770
Date:25.10.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1045770
Date:06.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60J7/12
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   PT [2000/43]
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHE ANLAGE FÜR EIN EIN AUFKLAPPBARES VERDECK AUFWEISENDES KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2000/43]
English:HYDRAULIC SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A HINGED CONVERTIBLE TOP[2000/43]
French:SYSTEME HYDRAULIQUE POUR AUTOMOBILE PRESENTANT UN TOIT REPLIABLE[2000/43]
Entry into regional phase09.03.2000National basic fee paid 
09.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
05.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2001Fee for grant paid
18.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT06.05.2002
[2003/06]
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0693390  (APPLIED POWER INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 6 - line 23; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE9000577U  (BAUMEISTER) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *