Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054687

EP1054687 - EXPRESSION VECTORS AND CELL LINES EXPRESSING VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR D, AND METHOD OF TREATING MELANOMAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.03.2009
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vegenics Limited
Level 1 10 Wallace Avenue
Toorak, Victoria 3142 / AU
[2008/27]
Former [2008/21]For all designated states
LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH
605 Third Avenue New York
New York 10158 / US
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH
605 Third Avenue
New York, New York 10158 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ACHEN, Marc, G.
Unit 3, 38 Chapman Street
North Melbourne, VIC 3051 / AU
02 / STACKER, Steven, Alan
30 McKean Street
North Fizroy, VIC 3068 / AU
03 / ALITALO, Kari
Nyyrikintie 4A
FIN-02100 Espoo / FI
 [2008/21]
Former [2000/48]01 / ACHEN, Marc, G.
Unit 3 38 Chapman Street
North Melbourne, VIC 3051 / AU
02 / STACKER, Steven, Alan
30 McKean Street
North Fizroy, VIC 3068 / AU
03 / ALITALO, Kari
Nyyrikintie 4A
FIN-02100 Espoo / FI
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London
WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2006/45]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/48]Harrison Goddard Foote
Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date98966053.523.12.1998
[2000/48]
WO1998US27373
Priority number, dateAU1997PP0113124.12.1997         Original published format: AU PP113197
US19980087392P29.05.1998         Original published format: US 87392 P
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9933485
Date:08.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054687
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1054687
Date:21.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/21]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1054687
Date:16.07.2008
[2008/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/19, A61K39/395, C12N15/85, C12N5/16, C12N15/11, G01N33/574
[2004/24]
Former International [2000/48]A61K38/18, C07K14/475, C07K14/49, C12N5/10, C12N15/18, C12N15/63
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/48]
TitleGerman:EXPRESSIONSVEKTOREN UND ZELLINIEN ZUR EXPRESSION VON VASKULÄREM WACHSTUMSFAKTOR D, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MELANOMEN[2000/48]
English:EXPRESSION VECTORS AND CELL LINES EXPRESSING VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR D, AND METHOD OF TREATING MELANOMAS[2000/48]
French:VECTEURS D'EXPRESSION ET LIGNEES CELLULAIRES EXPRIMANT LE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE ENDOTHELIAL VASCULAIRE D, ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES MELANOMES[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2000National basic fee paid 
21.07.2000Search fee paid 
21.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
21.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2008Fee for grant paid
01.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18]
Request for further processing for:26.04.2007Request for further processing filed
26.04.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.05.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
10.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
24.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200609   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
CY21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
GR22.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
IE23.12.2008
LU23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
CY21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
IE23.12.2008
LU23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/28]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
IE23.12.2008
LU23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/06]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
IE23.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/12]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/08]AT21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
Former [2009/07]AT21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
Former [2008/49]AT21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
ES01.09.2008
Former [2008/47]ES01.09.2008
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO9807832  (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al) [XP] 1-16,22,25,28,36-44 * see claims 1,8,14-16,25-33,37-39,46-50,58-59,65-69,74, page 8 lines 4-15, pages 9-10, page 13 lines 1-2, examples 8 and 13 *;
 [E]EP0935001  (CHUGAI RES INST MOLECULAR MED [JP]) [E] 1-8,13,14,25,31,36 * see claims 1-9, paragraphs [0022] and [0026] *;
 [XP]WO9824811  (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [XP] 1-16,22,24,25,32,33,36-44 * see pages 3-5, page 32 lines 12-24, pages 35-36 *;
 [X]WO9524473  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-16,22,24,25,28,32,36-44 * see claims, page 4, page 16 last paragraph, pages 22 and 24-25 *
International search[X]  - YAMADA Y, ET AL., "MOLECULAR CLONING OF A NOVEL VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR, VEGF-D", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO., US, US, (19970101), vol. 42, doi:10.1006/geno.1997.4774, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 483 - 488, XP002918205

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1997.4774
 [X]  - ORLANDINI M, ET AL., "IDENTIFICATION OF A C-FOS-INDUCED GENE THAT IS RELATED TO THE PLATELET-DERIVED GROWTH FACTOR/VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR FAMILY", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19961001), vol. 93, doi:10.1073/pnas.93.21.11675, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11675 - 11680, XP002918340

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.21.11675