Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044374

EP1044374 - GLUCOSE BIOSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/42]BIOSENSOR
[2008/20]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.08.2009
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES
published on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Duke University
230 North Building, Research Drive, Box 90083 Durham
North Carolina 27708-0083 / US
[2008/41]
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
DUKE UNIVERSITY
230 North Building, Research Drive, Box 90083
Durham, North Carolina 27708-0083 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HELLINGA, Homme, W.
5212 Pine Cone Lane
Durham, NC 27705 / US
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98966130.131.12.1998
[2000/42]
WO1998US27882
Priority number, dateUS19970070293P31.12.1997         Original published format: US 70293 P
[2000/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9934212
Date:08.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044374
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1044374
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/53, G01N33/532, G01N33/533, G01N33/66, G01N33/58
[2002/48]
Former International [2000/42]G01N33/53, G01N33/532, G01N33/533
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/42]
TitleGerman:GLUKOSEBIOSENSOR[2008/20]
English:GLUCOSE BIOSENSOR[2008/20]
French:BIOCAPTEUR DE GLUCOSE[2008/20]
Former [2000/42]BIOSENSOR
Former [2000/42]BIOSENSOR
Former [2000/42]BIOCAPTEUR
Entry into regional phase13.07.2000National basic fee paid 
13.07.2000Search fee paid 
13.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
04.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2008
07.04.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
10.04.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2008Fee for grant paid
15.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38]
Request for further processing for:05.10.2006Request for further processing filed
05.10.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.10.2006Decision despatched
09.08.2004Request for further processing filed
09.08.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.08.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
03.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
05.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CY08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
LU31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
GR09.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
[2018/36]
Former [2018/28]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CY08.10.2008
ES08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
LU31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
GR09.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
Former [2017/51]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CY08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
LU31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
GR09.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
Former [2011/25]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CY08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
LU31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
GR09.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
Former [2010/44]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CY08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
LU31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
PT17.02.2009
Former [2010/28]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
LU31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
PT17.02.2009
Former [2010/06]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
MC31.12.2008
PT17.02.2009
Former [2009/32]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
PT17.02.2009
Former [2009/30]AT08.10.2008
FI08.10.2008
PT17.02.2009
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[XP]  - MARVIN J S, HELLINGA H W, "ENGINEERING BIOSENSORS BY INTRODUCING FLUORESCENT ALLOSTERIC SIGNAL TRANSDUCERS: CONSTRUCTION OF A NOVEL GLUCOSE SENSOR", Journal of the American Chemical Society, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19980101), vol. 120, no. 01, doi:10.1021/ja972993f, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 07 - 11, XP001108840

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja972993f
 [XP]  - DATABASE FEDRIP ON DIALOG, NTIS, 00352410, Identifying No. 1R01RR14170-01, RAO G., "Protein Engineered Glucose Sensor", 1998.,
 [XP]  - DATABASE FEDRIP ON DIALOG, NTIS, 00313296, Identifying No. 1R21DK55234-01, DRUECKHAMMER D.G., "New Approaches to Fluorescence Based Glucose Sensors", 1998.,
 [Y]  - BRUNE M, ET AL., "DIRECT, REAL-TIME MEASUREMENT OF RAPID INORGANIC PHOSPHATE RELEASE USING A NOVEL FLUORESCENT PROBE AND ITS APPLICATION TO ACTOMYOSIN SUBFRAGMENT 1 ATPASE", Biochemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19940101), vol. 33, no. 27, doi:10.1021/bi00193a013, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 8262 - 8271, XP001108955

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00193a013
 [Y]  - MARVIN J S, ET AL., "THE RATIONAL DESIGN OF ALLOSTERIC INTERACTIONS IN A MONOMERIC PROTEIN AND ITS APPLICATIONS TO THE CONSTRUCTION OF BIOSENSORS (RATIONAL PROTEIN DESIGN/MALTOSE-BINDING PROTEIN/ALLOSTERY)", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19970401), vol. 94, no. 09, doi:10.1073/pnas.94.9.4366, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4366 - 4371, XP001108836

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.9.4366
 [A]  - PICKUP J., "DEVELOPING GLUCOSE SENSORS FOR IN VIVO USE.", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY., ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE., GB, GB, (19930701), vol. 11., doi:10.1016/0167-7799(93)90016-3, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 285 - 291., XP000915046

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(93)90016-3
 [A]  - WILKINS E, ATANASOV P, "GLUCOSE MONITORING: STATE OF THE ART AND FUTURE POSSIBILITIES", MEDICAL ENGINEERING & PHYSICS., BUTTERWORTH-HEINEMANN., GB, GB, (19960101), vol. 18, no. 04, doi:10.1016/1350-4533(95)00046-1, ISSN 1350-4533, pages 273 - 288, XP002918056

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1350-4533(95)00046-1
 [A]  - LI T, LEE H-B, PARK K, "COMPARATIVE STEREOCHEMICAL ANALYSIS OF GLUCOSE-BINDING PROTEINS FORRATIONAL DESIGN OF GLUCOSE-SPECIFIC AGENTS", JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE. POLYMER EDITION., VSP, UTRECHT., NL, NL, (19980101), vol. 09, no. 04, ISSN 0920-5063, pages 327 - 344, XP002918057