EP1056932 - TURBINE HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENKEL, Norbert Neuburgstrasse 15 D-40629 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
ZANDER, Uwe Möllhofstrasse 42 D-45475 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 03 /
GOBRECHT, Edwin Rossbruchring 50 D-40885 Ratingen / DE | [2000/49] | Application number, filing date | 98966202.8 | 08.12.1998 | [2000/49] | WO1998DE03607 | Priority number, date | DE1998106809 | 18.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19806809 | [2000/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942705 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056932 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1056932 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/26, F01D25/14, F01D25/10 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
F01D25/26 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/49] | Title | German: | TURBINENGEHÄUSE | [2000/49] | English: | TURBINE HOUSING | [2000/49] | French: | ENVELOPPE DE TURBINE | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.12.2002 | LI | 31.12.2002 | [2004/02] | Cited in | International search | [A]CH213312 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0354302 ; | [A]US5123241 (LOTAN DAN [FR]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 26 - line 35; figure 8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910524), vol. 015, no. 203, Database accession no. (M - 1116), & JP03054302 A 19910308 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | - ROBERT ERICH, "Temperaturmittlung in Turbinengehäusen", Allgemeine Wärmetechnik, Zeitschrift für Wärme-, Kälte- und Verfahrenstechnik, (1959), vol. 9, pages 163 - 182 |