Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027338

EP1027338 - NEW CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES, CARRYING AMIDO SIDE-CHAINS; PRODUCTION AND USE AS ENDOTHELIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abbott GmbH & Co. KG
Max-Planck-Ring 2
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/19]For all designated states
Abbott GmbH & Co. KG
Max-Planck-Ring 2
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / AMBERG, Wilhelm
Schälzigweg 79
D-68723 Schwetzingen / DE
02 / JANSEN, Rolf
C 2.20
D-68159 Mannheim / DE
03 / HERGENRÖDER, Stefan
Hans-Böckler-Strasse 108
D-55128 Mainz / DE
04 / RASCHACK, Manfred
Donnersbergstrasse 7
D-67256 Weisenheim / DE
05 / UNGER, Liliane
Wollstrasse 129
D-67065 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98966230.916.10.1998
[2000/33]
WO1998EP06571
Priority number, dateDE199714823831.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19748238
DE199715290428.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19752904
DE199810937605.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19809376
[2000/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9923078
Date:14.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1027338
Date:16.08.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/33]
Search report(s)International search reportEP10.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D239/00
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
Extension statesRO11.04.2000
SI11.04.2000
TitleGerman:NEUE CARBONSÄUREDERIVATE, DIE AMIDSEITENKETTEN TRAGEN, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG ALS ENDOTHELIN-REZEPTORANTAGONISTEN[2000/33]
English:NEW CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES, CARRYING AMIDO SIDE-CHAINS; PRODUCTION AND USE AS ENDOTHELIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS[2000/33]
French:NOUVEAUX DERIVES D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE, PORTANT DES CHAINES LATERALES AMIDEES; LEUR MODE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES RECEPTEURS D'ENDOTHELINE[2000/33]
Entry into regional phase11.04.2000National basic fee paid 
11.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
24.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/16]
17.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/16]
Request for further processing for:15.11.2002Request for further processing filed
15.11.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.11.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200205   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2003
31.10.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19614534  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 8, line 50 - page 10, line 15; claim 1; table 1 *;
 [D]WO9738980  (BASF AG [DE], et al)