Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040284

EP1040284 - PLANETARY GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/12]For all designated states
ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHULZ, Horst
Königsberger Strasse 3
D-88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
[2000/40]
Application number, filing date98966306.712.12.1998
[2000/40]
WO1998EP08116
Priority number, dateDE199715696620.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19756966
[2000/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932801
Date:01.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040284
Date:04.10.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1040284
Date:20.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16H1/28
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/40]
TitleGerman:PLANETENGETRIEBE[2000/40]
English:PLANETARY GEAR[2000/40]
French:ENGRENAGE PLANETAIRE[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2000National basic fee paid 
25.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
10.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2001Fee for grant paid
26.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]GB804223  (BROWN DAVID & SONS LTD) [A] 1,3 * page 1, line 60 - line 65 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB980089  (CENTRAX LTD) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 25 - line 26 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO8706671  (PFEFFER FRITZ) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 3 *;
 [DA]DE2941553  (WESTDEUTSCHE GETRIEBEWERK GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * figure 2 *;
 [DA]DE19603004  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * column 7, line 19 - line 31 * * figures 1-6 *