Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055159

EP1055159 - TROUBLEPROOF PROCESS INPUT AND OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.02.2007  [2007/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / TRAUTH, Armin
Lindenstrasse 40
D-76829 Landau / DE
02 / ZÄCH, Jörg-Peter
Hallstädterweg 44
D-90425 Nürnberg / DE
03 / WEBER, Karl
Zur Schanze 5
D-90518 Altdorf / DE
04 / BIRZER, Johannes
Dr.-Ram-Strasse 8
D-92536 Pfreind / DE
05 / BARTHEL, Herbert
Am Hasengarten 6A
D-91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
06 / SCHÜTZ, Hartmut
Friedhofstrasse 6
D-91336 Heroldsbach / DE
07 / FUCHS, Heiner
Wolfstaudenring 13 A
D-91056 Erlangen / DE
08 / VON KROSIGK, Hartmut
Platanenweg 3
D-91058 Erlangen / DE
09 / SCHENK, Andreas
Schenkstrasse 82
D-91052 Erlangen / DE
[2000/48]
Application number, filing date98966574.022.12.1998
[2000/48]
WO1998DE03771
Priority number, dateDE199810113714.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19801137
[2000/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936840
Date:22.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055159
Date:29.11.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055159
Date:08.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/042, G06F11/00
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/48]
TitleGerman:FEHLERSICHERE PROZESSEINGABE UND PROZESSAUSGABE[2000/48]
English:TROUBLEPROOF PROCESS INPUT AND OUTPUT[2000/48]
French:ENTREE ET SORTIE A SECURITE INTRINSEQUE DE SIGNAUX DE PROCESSUS[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2000National basic fee paid 
30.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
06.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2005Fee for grant paid
10.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4312305  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 21; figure 1 *;
 [XY]US4680753  (FULTON TEMPLE L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 4, line 41 - column 11, line 51; figures 1-12 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]DE3024370  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * page 4, line 33 - page 6, column 12; figures 1,2 *;
 [XP]EP0837394  (ELAN SCHALTELEMENTE GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,2,4-7 * column 6, line 43 - column 11, line 56; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0770942  (ELAN SCHALTELEMENTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column 6, line 7 - column 8, line 30; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0524330  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 56 - page 5, line 11; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4041550  (ELAN SCHALTELEMENTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 60; figures 1,2,5 *;
 [A]  - MOHLENBEIN H, "INTERBUS-DEZENTRALE ECHTZEIT-PERIPHERIE FUER STANDARD-SPS-SYSTEME", ELEKTRIE, (19900101), vol. 44, no. 7, pages 244 - 249, XP000162759 [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] *
 [A]  - HERTEL J, "ABSOLUT SICHERES GELEIT. REDUNDANZSTRUKTUREN IM MODERNEN PROZESSLEITSYSTEM TELEPERM XP", MESSEN UND PRUFEN, (19951001), vol. 31, no. 10, pages 10, 12 - 14, 16, XP000543694 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *