Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035865

EP1035865 - HIV-1 TAT, OR DERIVATIVES THEREOF FOR PROPHYLACTIC AND THERAPEUTIC VACCINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.08.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES
published on 12.09.2018  [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Istituto Superiore di Sanità
299 Viale Regina Elena
00161 Roma / IT
[2007/39]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Istituto Superiore di Sanità
299 Viale Regina Elena
00161 Roma / IT
Inventor(s)01 / ENSOLI, Barbara
Via Pollino, 2
I-00141 Rome / IT
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Ricker, Mathias
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/09]Ricker, Mathias, Dr.
Jones Day, Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/38]Gervasi, Gemma, Dr.
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98966601.130.11.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998EP07721
Priority number, dateIT1997RM0074301.12.1997         Original published format: IT RM970743
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9927958
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035865
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035865
Date:26.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/21, C12N15/49, C12N5/10, C07K14/16, C12N15/86
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Extension statesAL27.06.2000
LT27.06.2000
LV27.06.2000
MK27.06.2000
RO27.06.2000
SI27.06.2000
TitleGerman:HIV-1 TAT ODER DEREN DERIVATE FÜR PROPHYLAKTISCHE UND THERAPEUTISCHE IMPFUNG[2006/05]
English:HIV-1 TAT, OR DERIVATIVES THEREOF FOR PROPHYLACTIC AND THERAPEUTIC VACCINATION[2000/38]
French:TAT DE VIH-1 OU SES DERIVES COMME PRODUIT PROPHYLACTIQUE OU THERAPEUTIQUE DE VACCINATION[2000/38]
Former [2000/38]HIV-1 TAT ODER DEREN DERIVATE FÜR PROPHYLAKTISCHER UND THERAPEUTISCHER IMPFUNG
Entry into regional phase27.06.2000National basic fee paid 
27.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
09.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
29.12.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2006Fee for grant paid
15.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05026908.3  / EP1698347
Opposition(s)27.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36]
Request for further processing for:16.01.2004Request for further processing filed
15.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.02.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.09.2007
[2018/36]
Former [2018/28]ES26.09.2007
Former [2009/52]deleted
Former [2009/02]CY30.11.2007
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9531999  (IMMUNOGIOLOGY RESEARCH INST IN [US]) [X] 1,42,43 * the whole document * [A] 2-41,44-61;
 [X]WO9415634  (RATH MATTHIAS [US]) [X] 1,42,43 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9403596  (UNIV HAWAII [US]) [A] 161 * the whole document *;
 [PXA]WO9817309  (UNIV ERASMUS [NL], et al) [PX] 1,42,43 * the whole document * [A] 2-41,44-61;
 [XA]  - KIM D T ET AL, "Introduction of soluble proteins into the MHC class I pathway by conjugation to an HIV tat peptide.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1997 AUG 15) 159 (4) 1666-8, XP002083064 [X] 1,42,43 * the whole document * [A] 2-41,44-61
 [X]  - HINKULA J ET AL, "Nucleic acid vaccination with HIV regulatory genes: a combination of HIV-1 genes in separate plasmids induces strong immune responses", VACCINE, (199706), vol. 15, no. 8, page 874-878, XP004075674 [X] 1,42,43 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00257-5
 [DX]  - HINKULA J ET AL, "Recognition of prominent viral epitopes induced by immunization with human immunodeficiency virus type 1 regulatory genes.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1997 JUL) 71 (7) 5528-39, XP002083065 [DX] 1,42,43 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SAMANIEGO F ET AL, "Inflammatory cytokines induce endothelial cells to produce and release basic fibroblast growth factor and to promote Kaposi's sarcoma-like lesions in nude mice.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1997 FEB 15) 158 (4) 1887-94, XP002103367 [A] 1-61 * the whole document *