Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044018

EP1044018 - TUMOUR VACCINES FOR MUC1-POSITIVE CARCINOMAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2010
Database last updated on 13.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, BE, IT
published on 31.08.2011  [2011/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN
Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10
13125 Berlin / DE
[2009/30]
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN
Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10
D-13125 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KARSTEN, Uwe
Oderbruchstrasse 29
D-10407 Berlin / DE
02 / HANISCH, Franz-Georg
Graf-Gessler-Strasse 6
D-50679 Köln / DE
03 / PAULSEN, Hans
Hinsbeker Berg 11
D-22399 Hamburg / DE
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Baumbach, Friedrich
Patentanwalt
Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10
13125 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Baumbach, Friedrich, Dr.
Patentanwalt, Robert-Rössle-Str. 10
13125 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98966819.930.12.1998
[2000/42]
WO1998DE03819
Priority number, dateDE199715840030.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19758400
[2000/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9934824
Date:15.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1044018
Date:18.10.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1044018
Date:22.07.2009
Language:DE
[2009/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00, A61P35/00
[2009/07]
Former International [2000/42]A61K39/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/42]
TitleGerman:TUMORVAKZINE FÜR MUC1-POSITIVE KARZINOME[2009/07]
English:TUMOUR VACCINES FOR MUC1-POSITIVE CARCINOMAS[2000/42]
French:VACCIN ANTITUMORAL POUR CARCINOMES MUC1-POSITIFS[2000/42]
Former [2000/42]TUMORVAKZINE FUR MUC1-POSITIVE KARZINOME
Entry into regional phase19.07.2000National basic fee paid 
19.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
15.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2008
04.09.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
17.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
09.10.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2009Fee for grant paid
03.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
16.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
08.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
21.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IE22.07.2009
IT22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
ES02.11.2009
AT30.12.2009
BE31.12.2009
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]DK22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IE22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
ES02.11.2009
Former [2010/19]FI22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
ES02.11.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]WO8805054  (IMP CANCER RES TECH [GB]) [X] 1-7 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9005142  (IMP CANCER RES TECH [GB]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - F-Y. DUPRADEAU ET AL., "Solid-phase synthesis and immunoreactivity of penta-O-(N-acetyl-alpha-D-galactosaminyl)-MUC1 eicosapeptide, a glycosylated counter part of the highly immunogenic tandem repeat sequence of carcinoma-associated mucin.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, Oxford, Grossbritannien, (1994), vol. 4, no. 15, pages 1813 - 1818, XP002112481 [X] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)80376-0
 [X]  - J. TAYLOR-PAPADIMITRIOU ET AL., "Exploiting altered glycosylation patterns in cancer: progress and challenges in diagnosis and therapy.", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, Amsterdam, Niederlande, (199406), vol. 12, pages 227 - 233, XP002075467 [X] 1-7 * table 1 * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(94)90121-X
 [A]  - M. PRICE ET AL., "Summary report on the ISOBM TD-4 workshop: Analysis of 56 monoclonal antibodies against the MUC1 mucin.", TUMOR BIOLOGY, Basel, Schweiz, (199712), vol. 19, no. suppl. 1, pages 1 - 20, XP002112482 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000056500
 [A]  - D. SPENCER ET AL., "Effect of glycosylation of a synthetic MUC1 mucin-core-related peptide on recognition by anti-mucin antibodies.", CANCER LETTERS, Shannon, Irland, (19960227), vol. 100, no. 1-2, pages 11 - 15, XP002112483 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3835(95)04055-2
 [A]  - S. GOLETZ ET AL., "A sequencing strategy for the localization of O-glycosylation sites of MUC1 tandem repeats by PSD-MALDI mass spectrometry.", GLYCOBIOLOGY, Oxford, Grossbritannien, (199710), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 881 - 896, XP002112484 [A] 1-7 * abstract *
 [A]  - X. LIU ET AL., "Structurally defined synthetic cancer vaccines: analysis of structure, glycosylation and recognition of cancer associated mucin, MUC-1 derived peptides.", GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, London, Grossbritannien, (199510), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 607 - 617, XP002112485 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00731254
 [PX]  - U. KARSTEN ET AL., "Enhanced binding of antibodies to the DTR motif of MUC1 tandem repeat peptide is mediated by site-specific glycosylation.", CANCER RESEARCH, Baltimore, MD, VSA, (19980615), vol. 58, no. 12, pages 2541 - 2549, XP002112486 [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *