Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970076

EP0970076 - 7- (PIPERIDIN-1-YL)- PROPOXY -CHROMEN-4-ONE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/02]7-[(PIPERIDIN-1-YL)- PROPOXY]-CHROMEN-4-ONE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL USE
[2007/46]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2007Change - German titlepublished on 14.11.2007  [2007/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FERRER INTERNACIONAL, S.A.
Gran Via Carlos III, 94
08028 Barcelona / ES
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / FOGUET, Rafael
Lluçanès, 8
E-08022 Barcelona / ES
02 / BOLOS, Jordi
Avenida Josep Tarradellas, 35
E-08029 Barcelona / ES
03 / SACRISTAN, Aurelio
Santa Amèlia, 2
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
04 / CASTELLO, Josep, M.
Princep d'Asturies, 35
E-08012 Barcelona / ES
05 / ORTIZ, José, A.
Còrsega, 429
E-08037 Barcelona / ES
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Kinzebach, Werner , et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date98966856.129.12.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP08497
Priority number, dateES1997000271830.12.1997         Original published format: ES 9702718
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9935144
Date:15.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970076
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D413/14, A61K31/465
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesRO29.09.1999
TitleGerman:7- (PIPERIDIN-1-YL)-PROPOXY -CHROMEN-4-ON DERIVATE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN PHARMAZEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG[2007/46]
English:7- (PIPERIDIN-1-YL)- PROPOXY -CHROMEN-4-ONE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL USE[2007/46]
French:DERIVES 7- (PIPERIDINE-1-YL)-PROPOXY -CHROMENE-4-ONE, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION PHARMACEUTIQUE[2007/46]
Former [2000/02]7-[(PIPERIDIN-1-YL)-PROPOXY]-CHROMEN-4-ON DERIVATE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN PHARMAZEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG
Former [2000/02]7-[(PIPERIDIN-1-YL)- PROPOXY]-CHROMEN-4-ONE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL USE
Former [2000/02]DERIVES 7- (PIPERIDINE-1-YL)-PROPOXY]-CHROMENE-4-ONE, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION PHARMACEUTIQUE
Entry into regional phase29.09.1999National basic fee paid 
29.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
14.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/33]
12.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2001
31.12.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9632389  (FERRER INT [ES], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 1 - page 11; examples 1-3; claim - *;
 [DX]ES9600323  (FERRER)