Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1062878

EP1062878 - MIXED CRYSTALS COMPRISING ASPARTAME AND ASPARTAME DERIVATIVE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
[2008/07]
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KISHISHITA, Akihirai, Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-0801 / JP
02 / NAGASHIMA, Kazutaka, Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-0801 / JP
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Benedum, Ulrich Max , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Theatinerstrasse 3
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Benedum, Ulrich Max , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3
80333 München / DE
Former [2009/48]Benedum, Ulrich Max , et al
Haseltine Lake Partners Theatinerstrasse 3
80333 München / DE
Former [2007/18]Benedum, Ulrich Max , et al
Haseltine Lake Partners Theatinerstrasse 3
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/52]Nash, David Allan , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98967073.207.12.1998
[2000/52]
WO1998JP05532
Priority number, dateJP1997034477715.12.1997         Original published format: JP 34477797
[2000/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9930574
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1062878
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1062878
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Search report(s)International search reportJP24.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP13.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/236, A23L1/22, C07K5/06, C07C229/00, C07C229/36, A23G3/00
[2005/03]
Former International [2000/52]A23L1/236
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/52]
TitleGerman:MISCHKRISTALLE ENTHALTEND ASPARTAM UND ASPARTAMDERIVATE SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN[2000/52]
English:MIXED CRYSTALS COMPRISING ASPARTAME AND ASPARTAME DERIVATIVE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2000/52]
French:CRISTAUX MELANGES COMPRENANT DE L'ASPARTAME ET UN DERIVE DE L'ASPARTAME, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE[2000/52]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2000Translation filed 
05.07.2000National basic fee paid 
05.07.2000Search fee paid 
05.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
18.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2007Fee for grant paid
17.12.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0362706  (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [Y] 1,7 * page 2, line 39 - line 39 *;
 [YP]US5728862  (PRAKASH INDRA [US]) [YP] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [XPY]JPH10248520  ;
 [Y]US5473097  (KISHIMOTO SHINICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3-7 * claims 1-11,30 *;
 [E]EP0974272  (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [E] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5041607  (NARUSE MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,7 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 4; example - *;
 [Y]US5510508  (CLAUDE NOFRE [FR], et al) [Y] 1,7 * claims 1,8 *;
 [A]US4579747  (SUGIYAMA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0680971  (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0458750  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]JPH03204895  ;
 [A]EP0759030  (NOFRE CLAUDE [FR], et al)
 [XPY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, [XP] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3-7
 [A]  - 0, vol. 1991, no. 42, Database accession no. 1991-306732, XP002307835 [A] * abstract *
International search[A]JPH08503206