Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007522

EP1007522 - 2- 4-[4-(4,5-DICHLORO-2-METHYLIMIDAZOL-1-YL)BUTYL]PIPERAZIN-1-YL -5-FLUOROPYRIMIDINE, ITS PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/24]2- 4-[4-(4, 5-DICHLORO -2-METHYLIMIDAZOL-1-YL) BUTYL]-1-PIPERAZINYL -5-FLUOROPYRIMIDINE,PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE
[2002/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A.
Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221
08026 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A.
Av. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221
08026 Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / MERCE-VIDAL, Ramon
Marqués de Sentmenat, 44 3 B
E-08014, Barcelone / ES
02 / FRIGOLA-CONSTANSA, Jordi
Avenida Diagonal, 299 at. la
E-08013, Barcelone / ES
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Ahner, Francis , et al
CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98967138.328.05.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998EP03190
Priority number, dateFR1997000673802.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9706738
[2000/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9855476
Date:10.12.1998
Language:FR
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007522
Date:14.06.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1007522
Date:20.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D403/12, A61K31/415, A61K31/505
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:2- 4-[4-(4,5-DICHLOR-2-METHYLIMIDAZOL-1-YL)BUTYL]PIPERAZIN-1-YL -5-FLUORPYRIMIDIN, SEINE HERSTELLUNG UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG[2002/07]
English:2- 4-[4-(4,5-DICHLORO-2-METHYLIMIDAZOL-1-YL)BUTYL]PIPERAZIN-1-YL -5-FLUOROPYRIMIDINE, ITS PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE[2002/07]
French:2- 4-[4-(4,5-DICHLORO-2-METHYLIMIDAZOL-1-YL)BUTYL]PIPERAZIN-1-YL -5-FLUOROPYRIMIDINE, SA PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION THERAPEUTIQUE[2002/07]
Former [2000/24]2- 4-[4-(4,5-DICHLOR-2-METHYLIMIDAZOL-1-YL)BUTYL]-1-PIPERAZINYL -5-FLUORPYRIMIDINE ,IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG
Former [2000/24]2- 4-[4-(4, 5-DICHLORO -2-METHYLIMIDAZOL-1-YL) BUTYL]-1-PIPERAZINYL -5-FLUOROPYRIMIDINE,PREPARATION AND THERAPEUTIC USE
Former [2000/24]2- 4-[4-(4,5-DICHLORO -2-METHYLIMIDAZOL-1-YL) BUTYL]-1-PIPERAZINYL -5-FLUOROPYRIMIDINE, SA PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION THERAPEUTIQUE
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
01.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
31.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2002Fee for grant paid
09.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0497659  (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0655248  (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0382637  (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9721439  (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES], et al) [PX] 1-5 * column W *