Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0928891

EP0928891 - Cylinder block structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Isuzu Motors Limited
26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]For all designated states
ISUZU MOTORS LIMITED
26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ichikawa, Hiroyuki c/o Isuzu Motors Limited
Fujisawa Factory 8, Tsuchidana
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1999/28]
Representative(s)Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date99100036.504.01.1999
[1999/28]
Priority number, dateJP1998000414412.01.1998         Original published format: JP 414498
[1999/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0928891
Date:14.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0928891
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0928891
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02F7/00, F02F1/10, F02B77/11, F01M11/02
[2000/08]
Former International [1999/28]F02F7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1999/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zylinderblockaufbau[1999/28]
English:Cylinder block structure[1999/28]
French:Structure d'un bloc-cylindre[1999/28]
Examination procedure04.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
24.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
14.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2004Fee for grant paid
21.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9619655  (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 9 - page 9, line 20; figure - *;
 [A]US4712517  (ANNO NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 18; figure 4 *;
 [A]US4515112  (TSUCHIYA YASUHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]US4702204  (ANNO NOBUO [JP], et al)