Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0930515

EP0930515 - Method for distance measurement and contour sensing using microwaves [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wieland-Werke AG
89070 Ulm / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/11]For all designated states
WIELAND-WERKE AG
89070 Ulm / DE
Former [1999/29]For all designated states
Wieland-Werke AG
89070 Ulm / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Otto, Johanngeorg, Prof. Dr.-Ing.
Alemannenstrasse 3
73457 Essingen / DE
02 / Lust, Marcus
Schlesische Strasse 7
73431 Aalen / DE
03 / Müller, Hilmar R., Dr.-Ing.
Hoher Graben 11
89287 Bellenberg / DE
04 / Hansmann, Stephan, Dr.-Ing
Frauenstrasse 52
89073 Ulm / DE
05 / Stock, Dieter Dr.-Ing.
Finkenweg 9
88489 Wain / DE
[1999/29]
Application number, filing date99100064.705.01.1999
[1999/29]
Priority number, dateDE199810151116.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19801511
[1999/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0930515
Date:21.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0930515
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0930515
Date:15.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/89
[1999/29]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1999/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Abstandsmessung und Konturerfassung mittels Mikrowellen[1999/29]
English:Method for distance measurement and contour sensing using microwaves[1999/29]
French:Procédé de mesure de distance et de détection de contours utilisant des micro-ondes[1999/29]
Examination procedure07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
26.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2005Fee for grant paid
30.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3246084  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,11 * page 5, line 23 - page 8, line 22 * [Y] 6;
 [Y]WO9416339  (FOERSVARETS FORSKNINGSANSTALT [SE], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract *;
 [A]US5315306  (DOUGHTY JOHN K [US], et al) [A] 10 * abstract *