EP0933185 - Method and apparatus for injection compression moulding of fibre reinforced plastics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | Interruption | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | 29.08.2003 | Resumption | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REMAPLAN ANLAGENBAU GMBH Siemensstrasse 12 94405 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states remaplan Anlagenbau GmbH Siemensstrasse 12 94405 Landau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüttnauer, Rochus Clemens Schäuffeleweg 11 94405 Landau / DE | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100183.5 | 07.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | DE19981003422 | 29.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19803422 | [1999/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933185 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933185 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/53, B29C45/00, B29C45/13, B29C47/10, B29B17/00 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
B29C45/532 (EP);
B29C45/0005 (EP);
B29C45/13 (EP);
B29B17/0042 (EP);
B29B17/0412 (EP);
B29B2017/0476 (EP);
B29C45/561 (EP);
B29K2105/26 (EP);
Y02W30/52 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/31] | B29C45/53, B29C45/00, B29C45/13 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/42] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Spritzpressen von faserverstärkten Kunststoffen | [1999/31] | English: | Method and apparatus for injection compression moulding of fibre reinforced plastics | [1999/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mouler par injection compression des matières plastiques renforcées par des fibres | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 10.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 23.05.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/24] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.03.2003 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2003/42] | 09.02.2004 | Resumption of proceedings | [2003/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2128373 (FAHR BUCHER GMBH) [X] 1,2,13,17-19,21-24,57,58 * the whole document * [Y] 3,9-12,14-17,34,35,54-56,60,67-69; | [XY]GB2076730 (PONT A MOUSSON) [X] 1,2,13,18,19,21-24,58,59,61,62 * the whole document * [Y] 60; | [X]JPS63154318 ; | [X]FR2151494 (CHABRAND LOUIS) [X] 1,2,8,18-23,37,38,43-45,58,63 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0207932 (MAPLAN MASCH TECH ANLAGEN [AT]) [X] 1,2,8,18-24,37,42-45,57,58,63-66 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4236753 (KLOECKNER FERROMATIK DESMA [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,18-24,37,43-45,58,65,66 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2293304 (MULLER JOHAN A, et al) [Y] 9,67,68 * figures 1,4,5; claim 3 *; | [Y]FR2629751 (MANCEAU MARCEL [FR], et al) [Y] 10,69 * the whole document *; | [YA]DE2420686 (CENTRE IND RES LTD) [Y] 11 * the whole document * [A] 13; | [Y]JPH02153714 ; | [Y]JPH08325385 ; | [Y]EP0520345 (ACRILUX SPA [IT]) [Y] 54-56 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4021782 (WOLFF HANS MARTIN [CH]) [Y] 54-56 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4428867 (WAGENBLAST JOACHIM DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 17 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9718071 (SCHAEFER ELEKTROTECHNIK SONDER [DE], et al) [X] 6,7 * abstract * * page 1, line 16 - line 22 * * figure 1; claims 1-5 * [Y] 33; | [XY]WO9517293 (BACHER HELMUT [AT], et al) [X] 25-32 * column W * [Y] 33; | [XA]US4222728 (BACHER HELMUT, et al) [X] 25-27 * column W * [A] 6,7,28-33 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881104), vol. 12, no. 416, Database accession no. (M - 759), & JP63154318 A 19880627 (NIIGATA ENG CO LTD) [X] 1,2,18,19,21-24 * abstract * | [X] - R. KLEINHOLZ ET AL., "ZMC-Verfahren zur Herstellung von grossflächigen UP-Formteilen", PLASTVERARBEITER., SPEYER/RHEIN DE, (198308), vol. 34, no. 8, pages 685 - 688, XP002102092 [X] 1,2,13,15,16,18,19,21-24 * the whole document * | [X] - "Polyesters armés: les chances du "ZMC"", PLASTIQUES MODERNES ET ELASTOMERES., PARIS FR, (198109), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 53 - 55, XP002102093 [X] 1,2,13,18,19,21-24 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900831), vol. 14, no. 404, Database accession no. (M - 1018), & JP02153714 A 19900613 (TOYO MACH & METAL CO LTD) [Y] 3,34,35 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 97, no. 4, & JP08325385 A 19961210 (TORAY IND INC) [Y] 12,14-16 * abstract * |