Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0928642

EP0928642 - Automatic aspirator air control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A
Rochester, NY 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Former [1999/28]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mancini, Alfonso R.
796 Embury Road
Penfield, NY 14526 / US
02 / Williams, Richard A.
4545 Drury Road
Savannah, NY 13146 / US
03 / Hess, Ronald E.
750 Hightower Way
Webster, NY 14580 / US
 [2003/11]
Former [1999/28]01 / Mancini, Alfonso R.
796 Embury Road
Penfield, NY 14526 / US
02 / Williams, Richard A.
4545 Drury Road
Svannah, NY 13146 / US
03 / Hess, Ronald E.
750 Hightower Way
Webster, NY 14580 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99100200.707.01.1999
[1999/28]
Priority number, dateUS1998000447308.01.1998         Original published format: US 4473
[1999/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0928642
Date:14.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0928642
Date:29.03.2000
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0928642
Date:16.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B09C1/00, E21B43/12, // C02F103:06
[2000/13]
Former International [1999/28]B09C1/00, E21B43/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/49]
Former [1999/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatisches System zum Steuern der Luftabsaugung[1999/28]
English:Automatic aspirator air control system[1999/28]
French:Système automatique pour commander l'aspiration d'air[1999/28]
Examination procedure29.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
11.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2003Fee for grant paid
15.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0792700  (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 5,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - line 57 * * column 3, line 13 - line 32 * * column 5, line 27 - line 36 * * column 6, line 36 - column 8, line 13; figure - * * & US 08/606785 cited in the application * [Y] 1-4,6-8,10;
 [YA]WO9637317  (WESTINGHOUSE SAVANNAH RIVER CO [US]) [Y] 1-4,6-8,10 * page 10, line 21 - line 26 * * page 12, line 10 - line 14; figure 4 * [A] 5,9