Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0933497

EP0933497 - Drill tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAUER Maschinen GmbH
Wittelsbacherstrasse 5
86529 Schrobenhausen / DE
[2002/02]
Former [1999/31]For all designated states
Bauer Spezialtiefbau GmbH
Wittelsbacherstrasse 5
86529 Schrobenhausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reich, Reinhard
Fichtenweg 14
86568 Hollenbach / DE
02 / Harthauser Werner Josef, Dipl. Ing.
Pfarrer-Bunk-Strasse 19
86637 Wertingen / DE
 [2003/33]
Former [1999/31]01 / Reich, Reinhard
Fichtenweg 14
86568 Hollenbach / DE
Representative(s)Wunderlich, Rainer , et al
Weber & Heim Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]Wunderlich, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date99100208.007.01.1999
[1999/31]
Priority number, dateDE1998201700U02.02.1998         Original published format: DE 29801700 U
[1999/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0933497
Date:04.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0933497
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0933497
Date:20.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:E21B10/44, E21B10/04
[1999/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/12]
Former [1999/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bohrwerkzeug[1999/31]
English:Drill tool[1999/31]
French:Outil de forage[1999/31]
Examination procedure28.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
13.01.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.04.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
28.05.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2003Fee for grant paid
17.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3422541  (WESTFAELISCHE BERGGEWERKSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]US1512841  (GAMBLE JOSEPH R) [A] 1 * page 1, line 63 - line 79 *;
 [A]US3095051  (IVAN ROBINSKY ELI, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 16 - line 28 *