Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976336

EP0976336 - Helmet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARAI HELMET LIMITED
12, Azuma-cho 2-chome Ohmiya-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
ARAI HELMET LIMITED
12, Azuma-cho 2-chome
Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Arai, Michio c/o Arai Helmet Ltd
12 Azuma-cho 2-chome
Ohmiya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Denmark, James
Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD
Yorkshire / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Denmark, James
Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place
Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB
Application number, filing date99100482.112.01.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021719831.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21719898
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976336
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976336
Date:21.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A42B3/12
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Helm[2000/05]
English:Helmet[2000/05]
French:Casque[2000/05]
Examination procedure10.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
16.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2003Fee for grant paid
07.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPS5845325U  (..........);
 [A]DE8317310U  (HANS RÖMER GMBH + CO.);
 [A]WO9005464  (COOTER RODNEY DEAN [AU], et al);
 [A]FR2285823  (GILFRICHE ANDRE [FR]);
 [A]FR1214865  (A. DE GRIMAL)