Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0936366
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.09.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
05.07.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
05.10.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] |
13.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
28.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.12.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
27.10.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
18.02.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] |
02.07.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] |
02.07.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] |