Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0936366

EP0936366 - Breaking device for a linear guide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.11.2002  [2002/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INA-Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1 - 3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[2002/34]
Former [2001/47]For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler oHG
91072 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [1999/33]For all designated states
INA Wälzlager Schaeffler oHG
91072 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rudy, Dietmar
Pfaffstrasse 1
67655 Kaiserslautern / DE
[1999/33]
Application number, filing date99100613.114.01.1999
[1999/33]
Priority number, dateDE199810544911.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19805449
[1999/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0936366
Date:18.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0936366
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0936366
Date:21.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16C29/10, B23Q1/28
[1999/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/50]
Former [1999/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bremsvorrichtung für eine Linearführung[1999/33]
English:Breaking device for a linear guide[1999/33]
French:Frein pour guidage linéaire[1999/33]
Examination procedure14.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/33]
03.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2001Fee for grant paid
03.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US5678663  (WATANABE HITOSHI [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 30; figures 4-19 *;
 [A]US5460452  (HARA TAKEHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 24 - line 39; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US3741349  (BANKS R) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 18 - line 49; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4304950  (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 2 * column W *;
 [A]US4658669  (NISHIKAWA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 3 * column 2, line 4 - line 54; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]JPS61266825  ;
 [A]DE726570  (DEUTSCHE WAFFEN & MUNITIONSFAB) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870418), vol. 011, no. 125, Database accession no. (M - 582), [A] 3 * abstract *
ExaminationDE29613345U