blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0931593

EP0931593 - Waste solid treatment apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Saho, Norihide
2-4-12, Tanaka
Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Isogami, Hisashi
50-1-18, Hitachinohigashi
Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Morita, Minoru
3-15-29, Inayoshi, Chiyoda-machi
Niihani-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Finck, Dieter, et al
V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano
Patentanwälte
Mariahilfplatz 2-3
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99100829.318.01.1999
[1999/30]
Priority number, dateJP1998001100523.01.1998         Original published format: JP 1100598
[1999/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0931593
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0931593
Date:01.12.1999
[1999/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0931593
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:B03C1/00, B03C1/015, B03C1/025, C02F1/48
[1999/48]
CPC:
B03C1/025 (EP); B03C1/015 (EP); C02F1/488 (EP);
C02F1/52 (EP)
Former IPC [1999/30]B03C1/00, C02F1/48
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/32]
Former [1999/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von festem Abfall[1999/30]
English:Waste solid treatment apparatus[1999/30]
French:Dispositif pour le traitement des déchets solides[1999/30]
Examination procedure18.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/30]
26.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2003Fee for grant paid
06.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5360553  (BASKIS) [X] 7 * column 1, line 39 - line 43 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 52 *;
 [A]US4193866  (BROOKS ET AL) [A] 1,3,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3803033  (SUTHERLAND G) [A] 1,3,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19637711  (HITACHI LTD ;HITACHI TSUCHIURA ENGINEERING (JP)) [A] 1,3,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4294705  (HELLESTAM) [A] 1,3,6 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9847822  (HYDROPROCESSING L L C) [PA] 7 * claims 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.