Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0940908

EP0940908 - Oscillator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.09.2004  [2004/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/36]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Takeshi c/o Toshiba K.K. Intel.Prop.Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
[1999/36]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/36]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99100957.220.01.1999
[1999/36]
Priority number, dateJP1998005204504.03.1998         Original published format: JP 5204598
[1999/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0940908
Date:08.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0940908
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0940908
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03B5/20
[1999/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/01]
Former [1999/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Oszillator[1999/36]
English:Oscillator[1999/36]
French:Oscillateur[1999/36]
Examination procedure17.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/36]
13.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2003Fee for grant paid
18.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4818952  (KAWANO MITSUMO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 1; figure 3 * [A] 3,4 [Y] 5,7,8,13,14;
 [Y]US5420547  (KIKUCHI HIDEKAZU [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 64; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US5635879  (SUTARDJA PANTAS [US], et al) [Y] 5,13,14 * column 8, line 66 - column 11, line 29; figures 9-12 *