Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976898

EP0976898 - Locking handle for refrigerators [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003Refusal of applicationpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
White Consolidated Industries, Inc.
11770 Berea Road Cleveland
Ohio 44111 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
White Consolidated Industries, Inc.
11770 Berea Road
Cleveland Ohio 44111 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Alvring, Gunnar
Tarnegatan 13
45081 Grebbestad / SE
02 / Andersson, Kenneth
Nickelgatan 3
59161 Motala / SE
03 / Lindqvist, Per-Olof
Kulbanegatan 3
59151 Motala / SE
04 / Moseley, Andrew
Kornmarkt 4
35745 Herborn / DE
05 / Nilsson, Bo
Vimpelgatan 13
59170 Motala / SE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Former [2002/04]Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Former [2001/49]Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi
AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Patents, Trademarks & Licensing Muggenhofer Strasse 135
90429 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/05]Höchtl, Walter
AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
90327 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99101257.623.01.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateUS1998007561211.05.1998         Original published format: US 75612
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976898
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976898
Date:16.02.2000
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:E05B65/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/43]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verschlusshandhabe für Kühlgeräte[2000/05]
English:Locking handle for refrigerators[2000/05]
French:Poignée de fermeture pour réfrigérateurs[2000/05]
Examination procedure02.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
29.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/22]
06.01.2003Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2212563  (GROEGER ALFRED H) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 3, column 1, line 34 - page 3, column 2, line 50; figures 6-8 * [A] 3,11,13-17;
 [XA]DE2419225  (GABLER MARTIN) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 26; figure 1 * [A] 3,11,13-17;
 [XA]US3593550  (BERKOWITZ IRVING L) [X] 1,2,8 * column 1, line 70 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,13,15,16