EP0933921 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiroki, Umezawa 372-11, Nagaoka, Izunagaoka-chyo Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken 410-2211 / JP | 02 /
Atsushi, Kubota 660 Fushimi, Shimizu-tyo Suntou-gun, Shizuoka-ken 411-0907 / JP | 03 /
Hidehiro, Watanabe 6-7-21, Honkomagome,Bunkyou-ku Tokyo-to 113-0021 / JP | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/31] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99101276.6 | 23.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | JP19980015382 | 28.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1538298 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933921 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933921 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
H04N1/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/36] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abbildungsvorrichtung | [1999/31] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [1999/31] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 22.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4905027 (ITOH TETSUYA [JP]) [A] 1 * summary; column 3, lines 7-53 *; | [A]US5200831 (TAI HWAI-TZUU [US]) [A] 1 * summary; column 1, line 26 to column 2, line 59; column 4, line 58 to column 6, line 25 *; | [A]US5648801 (BEARDSLEY GARY SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5175635 (YAMADA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * summary; column 4, line 55 to column 5, line 38 *; | [A]US5232294 (INUI FUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1 * summary *; | [A]US5361142 (SEMASA TAKAYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * |