Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974820

EP0974820 - Restraint-elastomeric cushion bearing apparatus for determining the load thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2006
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 10.01.2018 [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FIP INDUSTRIALE S.P.A.
Via Scapacchiò, 41 I-35050 Selvazzano Dentro
(Padova) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
FIP INDUSTRIALE S.P.A.
Via Scapacchiò, 41
I-35050 Selvazzano Dentro (Padova) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Chiarotto, Renato
Via Scapacchio', 41
35030 Selvazzano Dentro / IT
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti
Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna
Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99101423.427.01.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0169222.07.1998         Original published format: IT MI981692
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974820
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974820
Date:20.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01L1/02, G01L1/20, G01L1/22
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lager zur Aufnahme von Kräften mit eingespanntem Elastomerkissen[2000/04]
English:Restraint-elastomeric cushion bearing apparatus for determining the load thereon[2000/04]
French:Appui de détermination de la force à coussin élastomérique enserré[2000/04]
Examination procedure16.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
29.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2005Fee for grant paid
11.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.07.2005
CH20.07.2005
LI20.07.2005
SE20.10.2005
[2018/02]
Former [2006/14]AT20.07.2005
CH20.07.2005
LI20.07.2005
SE20.10.2005
Former [2006/13]AT20.07.2005
SE20.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3502275  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 3, line 6 - page 3, line 10 * * page 5, line 15 - page 5, line 29 * * page 6, line 11 - page 6, line 30 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]CH158282  (ERICHSEN ABRAHAM MARTINIUS [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 2, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 2, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 4, column L, paragraph L - page 5, column L, paragraph L * * figure 2 *;
 [X]FR1438366  (B A R A) [X] 1-8 * page 1, column L, paragraph 8 - page 1, column R, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4402608  (GRUEGER CHRISTIAN DR [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *