Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0940155

EP0940155 - Apparatus for management of sleep apnea [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US
Former [1999/36]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bourgeois, Ivan
Rue Jean Gome 9
4802 Verviers / BE
02 / Sutton, Richard
149 Harley Street
London, W1N 1HG / GB
[1999/36]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/36]Hughes, Andrea Michelle , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99101620.503.02.1999
[1999/36]
Priority number, dateGB1998000238204.02.1998         Original published format: GB 9802382
[1999/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0940155
Date:08.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0940155
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0940155
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/36
[1999/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2001/04]
Former [1999/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Behandlung von Atemstillstand im Schlaf[1999/36]
English:Apparatus for management of sleep apnea[1999/36]
French:Appareil pour le traitement de l'apnée pendant le sommeil[1999/36]
Examination procedure07.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
18.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
14.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2004Fee for grant paid
20.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5178151  (SACKNER MARVIN A [US]) [A] 1 * column 24, line 15 - line 52 * * column 28, line 1 - line 8 *;
 [A]WO9301862  (CYBERONICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5299119  (KRAF TERI J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 46 - line 60 *;
 [A]WO9740885  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 11 *;
 [A]EP0702977  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5540733  (TESTERMAN ROY L [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantUS4830008
 US5123425
 US5174287
 US5178156
 US5190053
 US4573481
 US4602624
 US5095905
    GLENN, "Diaphragm Pacing : Present Status", PACE, (197807), vol. V. I., pages 357 - 370,