Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0936717

EP0936717 - Electrical switching apparatus employing interlocks for first and second trip functions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.11.2009  [2009/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
[2008/49]
Former [1999/33]For all designated states
EATON CORPORATION
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Matsko, Joseph Jacob
645 Seventh Street
Beaver, Pennsylvania 15009 / US
02 / Yanniello, Robert
110 Heywood Road
Arden, North Carolina 28704 / US
03 / Lagree, James Leo
352 Cobblestone Circle
McKees Rocks, Pennsylvania 15136 / US
[1999/33]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [1999/33]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99101767.412.02.1999
[1999/33]
Priority number, dateUS1998002436517.02.1998         Original published format: US 24365
[1999/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0936717
Date:18.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0936717
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0936717
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02H7/30, H02H7/26
[1999/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/03]
Former [1999/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrische Schalteinrichtung mit Verriegelung für erste und zweite Auslösebedingungen[2008/25]
English:Electrical switching apparatus employing interlocks for first and second trip functions[1999/33]
French:Appareil de commutation avec interverrouillage pour premier et deuxième fonctions de déclenchement[1999/33]
Former [1999/33]Elektrischer Schalteinrichtung mit Verriegelung für erste und zweite Auslösebedingungen
Examination procedure10.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2008Fee for grant paid
16.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0279689  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,9,16 * column 6, line 45 - line 62 *;
 [D]US4827369  (SALETTA GARY F [US], et al)