Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0933179

EP0933179 - Process and device for splitting a moulded concrete article into two blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.12.2002
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.02.2003  [2003/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIRKENMEIER KG GMBH & CO, Baustoffwerke
Industriegebiet 5-7
D-79206 Breisach / DE
For all designated states
METTEN Stein + Design GmbH & Co. KG
Industriegebiet Hammermühle
51491 Overath / DE
[1999/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Steeves, Terry P.
287 Armstrong Avenue
Georgetown, Ontario / CA
02 / Silk, Douglas F.
287 Armstrong Avenue
Georgetown, Ontario, L7G 4X6 / CA
[1999/31]
Representative(s)Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/27]Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät, Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen
Dreikönigstrasse 13
79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE
Former [1999/31]Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Hans Schmitt, Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Maucher, Dipl.-Ing. RA H. Börjes-Pestalozza, Dreikönigstrasse 13
79102 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date99101838.328.01.1999
[1999/31]
Priority number, dateCA1998222529229.01.1998         Original published format: CA 2225292
[1999/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0933179
Date:04.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0933179
Date:29.03.2000
[2000/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B28B7/14, B28B3/02
[1999/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT [2000/49]
Former [1999/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesMK20.04.2000
RO20.04.2000
SI20.04.2000
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Spalten von gegossenen Doppel-Betonblöcken[1999/31]
English:Process and device for splitting a moulded concrete article into two blocks[1999/31]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour séparer par rupture deux blocs de béton moulés ensemble[1999/31]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
28.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/07]
09.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2810946  (KATHRYN GARNICH) [A] 1,3,5-9,11-15,20-22,25,27,28,31 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3002247  (CLAYTON DETTLING JAMES, et al) [A] 1,3,5-15,20-22,25,27,28,31 * column W *;
 [A]DE2937704  (HERMANN KUESEL GMBH MASCHINEN) [A] 1,2,4,12,18,20,25,26,31 * page 7, line 27 - page 9, line 6 * * figures 1-7 *
by applicantUS5017049
 US5598679