Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0935336

EP0935336 - Method and device for controlling a synchronous motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diehl AKO Stiftung & Co. KG
Pfannerstrasse 75-79
88239 Wangen im Allgäu / DE
[2000/22]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
AKO-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Pfannerstrasse 75
88239 Wangen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Weinmann, Martin Dipl.-Ing.
Burghaldenweg 4
88339 Bad Waldsee / DE
02 / Zeh, Stefan Dipl.-Ing.
Schillerstrasse 19
88299 Leutkirch / DE
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Diehl Patentabteilung
c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]Diehl Patentabteilung
c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1999/32]Hofmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentassessor
Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99102107.203.02.1999
[1999/32]
Priority number, dateDE199810496707.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19804967
[1999/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0935336
Date:11.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0935336
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0935336
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/49]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0935336
Date:10.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02P6/24
[1999/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/08]
Former [1999/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Synchronmotors[1999/32]
English:Method and device for controlling a synchronous motor[1999/32]
French:Méthode et dispositif de commande d' un moteur synchron[1999/32]
Examination procedure02.05.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
27.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2002Fee for grant paid
28.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  22.07.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestr. 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
 03  31.07.2003  11.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
ZF Sachs AG
97419 Schweinfurt / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 02  22.07.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestr. 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
 03  31.07.2003  11.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
ZF Sachs AG
97419 Schweinfurt / DE
Former [2003/39]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
 02  22.07.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestr. 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
 03  31.07.2003   
ZF Sachs AG
97419 Schweinfurt / DE
Former [2003/38]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
 02  22.07.2003  01.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestr. 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2003/32]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2003   
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
13.10.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.02.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.07.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.07.2005Date of oral proceedings
30.09.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.09.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.02.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
14.03.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200103   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9705691  (FANUC LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [X]DE3614093  (QUICK ROTAN ELEKTROMOTOREN [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 2, line 60 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 57 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0714162  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0078394  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH01190286  ;
 [AD]EP0662266  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891102), vol. 013, no. 483, Database accession no. (E - 839), [A] 1-7 * abstract *