Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0935118

EP0935118 - High missile packing density launching system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.04.2006  [2006/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lockheed Martin Corporation
6801 Rockledge Drive
Bethesda, MD 20817 / US
[2006/01]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
Lockeed Martin Corporation
680 American Avenue
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Basak, Leszek Stanislaw
30 Bartley Court
Baltimore, MD 21236 / US
 [2004/33]
Former [1999/32]01 / Basak, KLeszek Stanislaw
30 Bartley Court
Baltimore, MD 21236 / US
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date99102236.904.02.1999
[1999/32]
Priority number, dateUS1998002033106.02.1998         Original published format: US 20331
[1999/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0935118
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0935118
Date:03.01.2001
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0935118
Date:20.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:F41F3/04, F41A19/68, F41A19/65
[2001/01]
Former International [1999/32]F41F3/04, F41A19/65
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/42]
Former [2001/38]FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [1999/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abschussvorrichtung für selbstangetriebene Flugkörper mit hoher Packungsdichte[1999/32]
English:High missile packing density launching system[1999/32]
French:Dispositif de lancement pour missile auto-propulsé ayant une haute densité d'empaquetage[1999/32]
Examination procedure03.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
03.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2005Fee for grant paid
04.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US3049056  (EVANS PAUL I, et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 9 - line 21 * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 39 * * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 59; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US3974740  (BILLOTTET HENRI, et al) [A] 1,5 * column A * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 46; figure - *;
 [A]US5327809  (MATTESON PHILIP L [US], et al) [A] 4 * column A * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 8; figures 4-7 *;
 [A]US3064537  (BALLER MAURICE H, et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 30 - line 44 * * column 1, line 67 - column 4, line 74; figure - *