Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981052

EP0981052 - Semiconductor accelerometer switch and a method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshikawa, Eiji
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / Tsugai, Masahiro
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E. , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99102300.305.02.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateJP1998023077717.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23077798
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981052
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0981052
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01P15/135, G01P15/08, G01P15/125
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/48]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halbleiterbeschleunigungsschalter und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[2000/08]
English:Semiconductor accelerometer switch and a method of producing the same[2000/08]
French:Accéléromètre semi-conducteur à interrupteur et methode pour sa fabrication[2000/11]
Former [2000/08]Accéléromètre semi-conducteur à interrupteur et méthode pour sa fabrication
Examination procedure30.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
14.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
07.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE4126107  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 15; figure 5 * [A] 5,8,9 [Y] 7,10;
 [X]EP0526923  (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 34; figures 1,2 *;
 [PX]US5828138  (MCIVER GEORGE WILLIAM [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,6,9 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 2 * * column 14, line 11 - column 15, line 34; figures 1,2,15 *;
 [Y]EP0567938  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 7 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 35; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US5549785  (SAKAI MINEKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * column 8, line 41 - column 9, line 42; figures 18-24; claim 1 *