Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0938875

EP0938875 - Dental prosthesis support and method for its application [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Martelli, Roberto
Corso Cavallotti, 8
28100 Novara / IT
For all designated states
Massironi, Domenico
Cascina Isabella
26816 Ossago Lodigiano (Lodi) / IT
[1999/35]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/35]
Representative(s)Ripamonti, Enrico , et al
Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]Ripamonti, Enrico, Dr. Ing. , et al
Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. s.r.l., 19/B, Via Rosolino Pilo
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99102448.009.02.1999
[1999/35]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0038526.02.1998         Original published format: IT MI980385
[1999/35]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0938875
Date:01.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0938875
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/30
[1999/35]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2001/04]
Former [1999/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zahnersatzträger sowie Einsetzverfahren[1999/35]
English:Dental prosthesis support and method for its application[1999/35]
French:Support de prothèse dentaire et méthode pour sa mise en place[1999/35]
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
18.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT
08.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
26.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9625119  (REYNAUD MARC [FR], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9 * page 1, line 3 - line 6 * * page 3, line 7 - line 18 * * page 6, line 10 - line 15 * * page 7, line 4 - line 8 * * page 7, line 14 - line 17 * * figures 1,3 * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]US4820159  (WEISSMAN BERNARD [US]) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 54 - line 59 * * column 8, line 34 - line 41 * * figures 22,23 *;
 [X]DE3901640  (COMPODENT RESEARCH AND APPLIC [IL]) [X] 1,4,5,8,9 * column 1, line 57 - line 62 * * column 2, line 7 - line 15 * * column 3, line 35 - line 37 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5145373  (ROANE JAMES B [US]) [A] 4,8 * column 1, line 26 - line 34 * * column 5, line 26 - line 37; figure 4 * * figure 11 *;
 [E]US5964592  (HITES ANDRAS A [US], et al) [E] 1,4-9 * column 3, line 40 - line 43 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 21 - line 26 * * column 4, line 35 - line 39 * * figure 4; claim 1 *