blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0945502

EP0945502 - A mutated subtilisin protease [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.09.2012
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE
published on 24.07.2013  [2013/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Former [1999/39]For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Branner, Sven
Ved Smedebakken 7A
2800 Lyngby / DK
02 / Simonsen, Merete
Nordtoftevej 63
3520 Farum / DK
03 / Hastrup, Sven
Sankt Hans Gade 1. 2.tv
2200 Kobenhavn N / DK
04 / Aaslyng, Dorrit
Gartnerkrogen 69
3500 Vaerlose / DK
05 / Olsen, Ole Hvilsted
Baekkeskovvej 38
2700 Bronshoj / DK
06 / Norskov-Lauritsen, Leif
Strandvejen 80
4733 Tappernoje / DK
07 / Casteleijn, Eric
Palletierburg 105
2907 CG Cappelle a/d Ijssel / NL
08 / Marugg, John David
Fivelingo 141
3524 BL Utrecht / NL
09 / Egmond, Maarten Robert
Catharijnesingel 114
3511 GW Utrecht / NL
10 / Mooren, Arnoldus Theodorus Antonius
Zwaluwenlaan 461
3136 TP Vlaardingen / NL
11 / Haverkamp, Johan
De Kroeskarper 40
2661 KL Bergschenhoek / NL
[1999/52]
Former [1999/39]01 / Branner, Sven
Ved Smedebakken 7A
2800 Lyngby / DK
02 / Simonsen, Merete
Blegdamsvej 114, 4th
2100 Kobenhavn O / DK
03 / Hastrup, Sven
Sankt Hans Gade 1. 2.tv
2200 Kobenhavn N / DK
04 / Aaslyng, Dorrit
Gartnerkrogen 69
3500 Vaerlose / DK
05 / Olsen, Ole Hvilsted
Baekkeskovvej 38
2700 Bronshoj / DK
06 / Norskov-Lauritsen, Leif
Strandvejen 80
4733 Tappernoje / DK
07 / Casteleijn, Eric
Palletierburg 105
2907 CG Cappelle a/d Ijssel / NL
08 / Marugg, John David
Fivelingo 141
3524 BL Utrecht / NL
09 / Egmond, Maarten Robert
De Ness 34
3461 GD Linschoten / NL
10 / Mooren, Arnoldus Theodorus Antonius
Zwaluwenlaan 461
3136 TP Vlaardingen / NL
11 / Haverkamp, Johan
De Kroeskarper 40
2661 KL Bergschenhoek / NL
Representative(s)Wright, Andrew John, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/47]Wright, Andrew John, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2002/20]Stevens, Ian Edward
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/04](deleted)
Former [2000/04]Jensen, Bo Hammer, et al
Novo Nordisk A/S, Enzyme Business Patents, Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Former [1999/39]Jensen, Bo Hammer, et al
c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Application number, filing date99102452.226.06.1990
[1999/39]
Priority number, dateDK1989000316926.06.1989         Original published format: DK 316989
[1999/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0945502
Date:29.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0945502
Date:20.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.1999
ClassificationIPC:C12N9/54, C11D3/386
[1999/39]
CPC:
C11D3/386 (EP); C12N9/50 (KR); C11D3/38636 (EP);
C12N9/54 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1999/39]
TitleGerman:Mutierte Subtilisin-protease[1999/39]
English:A mutated subtilisin protease[1999/39]
French:Protéase de subtilisine ayant subi une mutation[2005/01]
Former [1999/39]Prothèse de subtilisine ayant subi une mutation
Examination procedure29.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
09.03.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
09.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2005Fee for grant paid
21.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP90910604.9  / EP0479870
Divisional application(s)EP05075168.4  / EP1553173
EP05075169.2  / EP1555314
EP05075170.0  / EP1553174
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.01.2006    ADMISSIBLE
Genencor International, Inc.
925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto
CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Forrest, Graham Robert
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2006/10]
Opponent(s)01  18.01.2006    ADMISSIBLE
Genencor International, Inc.
925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto
CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Forrest, Graham Robert
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
deletedDespatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.03.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.11.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.02.2008Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2011Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.06.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.06.2012Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/44]
Appeal following opposition13.05.2008Appeal received No.  T0938/08
22.07.2008Statement of grounds filed
15.04.2010Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
15.04.2010Date of oral proceedings
27.04.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:18.03.2003Request for further processing filed
10.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.03.2003Decision despatched
08.03.2002Request for further processing filed
06.03.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.04.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
09.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
09.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
09.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
09.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
09.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 11
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 12
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 13
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 14
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 15
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU26.06.2005
GB25.06.2010
DE26.06.2010
ES28.06.2010
[2013/30]
Former [2011/25]LU26.06.2005
GB25.06.2010
ES28.06.2010
Former [2007/26]LU26.06.2005
Former [2007/18]LU30.06.2005
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO8906279  (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [PX] 1-32 * claim - *;
 [PX]WO8909819  (GENEX CORP [US]) [PX] 1-32 * claim - *;
 [PX]WO8909830  (GENEX CORP [US]) [PX] 1-32 * page 10 *;
 [X]  - ALAN J. RUSSELL ET AL., "Electrostatic effects on modification of charged groups in the active site cleft of subtilisin by protein engineering", J. MOL. BIOL., London, (1987), vol. 193, pages 803 - 813, XP002900491 [X] 1-39 * table 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(87)90360-3
 [X]  - ALAN J. RUSSELL ET AL., "Rational modification of enzyme catalysis by engineering surface charge", NATURE, (19870806), vol. 328, pages 496 - 500, XP002900492 [X] 1-39 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/328496a0
 [A]  - PAUL G. THOMAS ET AL., "Tailoring the pH dependence of enzyme catalysis using protein engineering", NATURE, (19851128), vol. 318, pages 375 - 376, XP002900493 [A] 1-39

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/318375a0
 [A]  - MICHAEL J.E. STERNBERG ET AL., "Prediction of electrostatic effects of engineering of protein charges", NATURE, (19871105), vol. 330, pages 86 - 88, XP002900494 [A] 1-39

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/330086a0
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.