Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0945709

EP0945709 - Method and apparatus for determining the position of an inductive displacement sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/39]Method for measuring the position of an inductive displacement sensor
[2002/46]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [1999/39]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stoll Bernward
Hofhausstrasse 14
60389 Frankfurt / DE
[1999/39]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [1999/39]Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99102718.618.02.1999
[1999/39]
Priority number, dateDE199811306325.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19813063
[1999/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0945709
Date:29.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0945709
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/20
[1999/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/24]
Former [1999/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Position eines induktiven Wegsensors[2002/46]
English:Method and apparatus for determining the position of an inductive displacement sensor[2002/46]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour déterminer la position d'un capteur inductif de déplacement[2002/46]
Former [1999/39]Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Position eines induktiven Wegsensors
Former [1999/39]Method for measuring the position of an inductive displacement sensor
Former [1999/39]Procédé de détection de position d'un capteur inductif de déplacement
Examination procedure09.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/30]
25.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2003Fee for grant paid
17.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE4443259  (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-3,10 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 2 * * column 7, line 58 - line 64 *;
 [Y]EP0561054  (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,10 * figures 1A,3; claim 1 *