Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965371

EP0965371 - High-score display system for a video game [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.01.2010
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.02.2010  [2010/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Midway Games, Inc.
3401 North California
Chicago, IL 60618 / US
[1999/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Dickinson, Vince
3401 North California Avenue
Chicago, IL 60618 / US
02 / Newcomer, John R.
3401 North California Avenue
Chicago, IL 60618 / US
[1999/51]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date99102915.812.02.1999
[1999/51]
Priority number, dateUS1998007158201.05.1998         Original published format: US 71582
[1999/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0965371
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0965371
Date:28.03.2001
[2001/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP14.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A63F9/22, A63F13/10
[2001/13]
Former International [1999/51]A63F9/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/51]
Former [1999/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Darstellungssystem für höhere Spielstände in einem Videospiel[1999/51]
English:High-score display system for a video game[1999/51]
French:Système de représentation de scores élevés dans un jeu vidéo[1999/51]
Examination procedure19.09.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
10.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/08]
06.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH06165874  ;
 [Y]US5720663  (NAKATANI HAJIME [JP], et al) [Y] 29 * column 1, line 14 - line 18 * * column 5, line 3 - line 5 * * figure 11A *;
 [Y]US4600200  (OKA MASAYO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4,20,29 * column 4, line 35 - line 42 * * figure 2 *;
 [PA]EP0864342  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [PA] 1,9,15,20,29 * abstract *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940916), vol. 018, no. 495, Database accession no. (C - 1250), [X] 9,15,19 * abstract * [Y] 1,4,20