Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1029945

EP1029945 - Method for coating tools [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BALZERS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
9496 Balzers / LI
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
BALZERS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
9496 Balzers / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Derflinger, Volker
Altenburggasse 19
6800 Feldkirch / AT
02 / Zimmermann, Harald
Mutterstrasse 31 A
6880 Feldkirch-Levis / AT
03 / Wohlrab, Christian
Weinberggasse 31 A
6800 Feldkirch / AT
[2000/34]
Representative(s)Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte
Postfach
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach
8050 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99103093.317.02.1999
[2000/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1029945
Date:23.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C23C30/00, C23C14/06, B23B27/00
[2000/34]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/19]
Former [2000/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Beschichten von Werkzeugen[2000/34]
English:Method for coating tools[2000/34]
French:Procédé de revêtement d'outils[2000/34]
Examination procedure23.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/01]
20.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.04.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5272014  (LEYENDECKER TONI [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,4-8,10,11,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5318840  (IKEDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * example 1 *;
 [A]DE19517120  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 9,12,17,18 * page 4, line 36; figure 6; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE19526387  (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * example 3 *