Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018497

EP1018497 - Method for producing free flowing lime-based materials for coating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Strotmann, Rochus
Virchowstrasse 8
50935 Köln / DE
[2000/28]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Junius, Walther
Wolfstrasse 24
30519 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Junius, Walther, Dr.
Wolfstrasse 24
30519 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date99103174.118.02.1999
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateDE199910033207.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19900332
[2000/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018497
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018497
Date:23.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:C04B40/00, C04B28/10, C01F11/02, // (C04B28/10, 14:02, 22:06, 24:26, 24:38)
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/12]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von fliess-, streich- und spachtelfähigen Kalkmassen[2000/28]
English:Method for producing free flowing lime-based materials for coating[2000/28]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de masses de revêtement à base de chaux à écoulement libre[2000/28]
Examination procedure11.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
13.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2003Fee for grant paid
10.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE23.04.2003
IT23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2007/04]IE23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/23]NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/02]NL23.04.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE23.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[DY]DE19605701  (STROTMANN ROCHUS [DE]) [DY] 1-10 * Das ganze Dokument *;
 [Y]EP0467165  (WALHALLA KALK ENTWICKLUNGS UND [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * claim 27 *;
 [DA]AT214340B  (SVATOS LADISLAV) [DA] * claim . *