Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033152

EP1033152 - Measuring device for impacts, in particular blows in fighting sports [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alt, Norbert
Salurner Strasse 26
6330 Kufstein / AT
For all designated states
Trabesiner, Johann
Lind 254
6330 Itter / AT
For all designated states
Moser, Hubert
Otto-Lasne-Strasse 1
6330 Kufstein / AT
For all designated states
Hammerer, Karl Heinz Dr.
Amberg 61
6330 Schwoich / AT
[2001/51]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Alt, Norbert
Salurner Strasse 26
6330 Kufstein / AT
For all designated states
Trabesiner, Johan
Lind 254
6330 Itter / AT
For all designated states
Moser, Hubert
Otto-Lasne-Strasse 1
6330 Kuffstein / AT
For all designated states
Hammerer, Karl Heinz Dr.
Amberg 61
6330 Schwoich / AT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Torggler, Paul Norbert , et al
Torggler & Hofinger
Patentanwälte
Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16
6020 Innsbruck / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Torggler, Paul Norbert , et al
Wilhelm-Greilstrasse 16
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Application number, filing date99103272.319.02.1999
[2000/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033152
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033152
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A63B71/06
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI20.06.2000
TitleGerman:Messeinrichtung für Schläge bzw. Treffer bei Kampfsportarten[2000/36]
English:Measuring device for impacts, in particular blows in fighting sports[2000/36]
French:Dispositif de mesure d'impacts en particulier dans les sports de combats[2000/36]
Examination procedure31.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/36]
31.08.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
02.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.12.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
31.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2000Fee for grant paid
20.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.06.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, FI, IE, LI, LU, MC
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.04.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.04.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9518655  (ANDERSSON LARS [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 2 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE3903127  (SCHRAMM GUENTHER [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 2, line 15 - line 54 * * column 3, line 40 - line 61 * * figure - *;
 [X]US4208048  (WINTERBOTTOM HAROLD E [US]) [X] 1,8,9,11 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 34 * * figures 6,7 *
ExaminationUS4850224