Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1031359

EP1031359 - Apparatus for performing exercise with two training stations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.01.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.03.2003  [2003/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Caribbean Fit Mgt. Ltd.
No. 6 Front Street Phillipsburg
St. Maarten / NA
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
Caribbean Fit Mgt. Ltd.
No. 6 Front Street
Phillipsburg, St. Maarten / NA
Inventor(s)01 / Sollinger, Mark A.
30 Black Rock Road
Warwick, NY 10990 / US
[2000/35]
Representative(s)EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS
Horneggstrasse 4
8008 Zürich / CH
[2000/35]
Application number, filing date99103400.022.02.1999
[2000/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1031359
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A63B21/062
[2000/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/20]
Former [2000/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Muskelübungsgerät mit zwei Trainingsstationen[2000/35]
English:Apparatus for performing exercise with two training stations[2000/35]
French:Appareil de musculation avec deux stations d'entraînement[2000/35]
Examination procedure26.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
01.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.06.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT
02.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/10]
07.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.04.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2921953  (KLOTZKI ULRICH) [A] 1,5 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 36; figures 1-3; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US4775146  (STANKOVIC GUS [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 55 - column 5, line 35; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4349192  (LAMBERT JR LLOYD J, et al) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 62; figures 1-5 *
by applicantUS4634118
 US5518477